DEMOYA v. MCMAHON et al
Plaintiff: Joaquin Demoya
Defendant: Automotive Remarketing Group doing business as Americas Auto Auction and Dennis Mcmahon
Case Number: 1:2020cv01281
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures - Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/27/2020. (ktt)
July 27, 2020 Filing 15 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 5:20-cv-01609 containing electronic documents.
June 29, 2020 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference was held on 6/23/20 and not placed on the record. (dt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/27/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF 6/23/20 THAT THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER THIS CIVIL ACTION TO THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA IS GRANTED. THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER THIS MATTER TO THE U.S.D.C. MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 6/23/20.6/23/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/27/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Transfer filed by AUTOMOTIVE REMARKETING GROUP, DENNIS MCMAHON.Memorandum of Law. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Confidential)(WIRTH, AMY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/27/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN. A Telephonic Settlement Conference was held on 6/17/20. (DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/27/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF 6/8/20 THAT IT IS HEREBY GRANTED THAT CRAIG M. KADISH IS ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE IN THE ABOVE-REFERENCED MATTER. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 6/8/20.6/8/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT) (COPY AND ECF APP NOT MAILED TO CRAIG M. KADISH, ESQUIRE) Modified on 6/8/2020 (dt, ). Modified on 6/9/2020 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/27/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of Craig M. Kadish filed by JOAQUIN DEMOYA..(LUTZ, DAVID) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/27/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF 5/14/20 THAT A TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT/STATUS CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON JUNE 17, 2020 AT 2:30PM. ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: HENRY S. PERKIN ON 5/14/20. 5/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/27/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF 5/14/20 THAT AN IN PERSON SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON JULY 20, 2020 AT 9:30AM. ETC. SIGNED BY: JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 5/14/20. 5/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/27/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF 5/12/20 THAT A TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON JUNE 23, 2020 AT 3:00PM. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 5/12/20. 5/12/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dt, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/27/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF 5/12/20 THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: HENRY S. PERKIN FOR THE PURPOSE OF SCHEDULING AND CONDUCTING A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 5/12/20. 5/12/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dt, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/27/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by AUTOMOTIVE REMARKETING GROUP, DENNIS MCMAHON.(WIRTH, AMY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/27/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by AUTOMOTIVE REMARKETING GROUP, DENNIS MCMAHON.(WIRTH, AMY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/27/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by AMY G. WIRTH on behalf of AUTOMOTIVE REMARKETING GROUP, DENNIS MCMAHON (WIRTH, AMY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/27/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DENNIS MCMAHON, AUTOMOTIVE REMARKETING GROUP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14199919.), filed by JOAQUIN DEMOYA.(LUTZ, DAVID) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/26/2020: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Designation Form) (lisad, ). Modified on 3/26/2020 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEMOYA v. MCMAHON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joaquin Demoya
Represented By: Craig M. Kadish
Represented By: David L. Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automotive Remarketing Group doing business as Americas Auto Auction
Represented By: Amy G. Wirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Mcmahon
Represented By: Amy G. Wirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?