Zguro v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Larry T. Zguro
Defendant: Theodore W. Johnson, Superintendant Thomas McGinley, Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole and SCI-Coal Township
Case Number: 1:2020cv01301
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MA
Referring Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 Certified Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Larry T. Zguro. (ao)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the superintendent or warden of the institution at which Plaintiff is currently incarcerated is directed to provide certified copies of the statement of Pltf's trust fund account to this Court and to the Plaintiff. The statement should reflect all activity in that account for the six-month period immediately preceding the lodging of the complaint in this action. Order sent to Superintendent and plaintiff. Signed by LP on 08/18/2020. (lp)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 AO 398 and AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (ao)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Larry T. Zguro. (ao)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION (Application) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, including certification, by Larry T. Zguro.(ao) Modified on 8/18/2020 (lp).
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Theodore W. Johnson, Thomas McGinley, filed by Larry T. Zguro.(ao)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 07/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 CIVIL RIGHTS PRISONER PACK) (lp)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Larry T. Zguro.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zguro v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore W. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendant Thomas McGinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI-Coal Township
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry T. Zguro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?