Machicote v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Lee Machicote
Defendant: David J. Close, Dr. Walmer, M.D., Bobby Jo Salamon and Barry Smith
Case Number: 1:2020cv01315
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MA
Referring Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by David J. Close, Bobby Jo Salamon, Barry Smith, Dr. Walmer, M.D.. All Defendants. (Blake, Jonathan)
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Blake on behalf of All Defendants (Blake, Jonathan)
September 5, 2020 Receipt of payment from ANTHONY LEE MACHICOTE in the amount of $68.33 for PLRA CIVIL FILING FEE. Transaction posted on 9/3/2020. Receipt number 111025970 processed by aarlidge. (jjs)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to All Defendants Waiver of Service due by 9/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Labels)(dmn)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants - AND NOW, on this 17th day of August, 2020, Plaintiffs application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. No. 2), is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send a copy of this order to the Superintendent/Warden of the institution where Plaintiff is presently confined The complaint is DEEMED filed. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 8/17/20. (dmn)
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFIED Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re Anthony Lee Machicote. (bg) Modified on 8/12/2020 (lp).
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 U.S. MARSHAL - Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (bg)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the superintendent or warden of the institution at which Plaintiff is currently incarcerated is directed to provide certified copies of the statement of Plaintiff's trust fund account to this Court and to the Plaintiff. The statement should reflect all activity in that account for the six-month period immediately preceding the lodging of the complaint in this action. Order sent to Superintendent and plaintiff.Signed by LP on 07/30/2020. (lp)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Instruction Sheet, #3 Federal & Local Rules, #4 398 Form, #5 399 Form) (lp)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 AO 398 and AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (lp)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Anthony Lee Machicote. (lp)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Lee Machicote.(lp)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Anthony Lee Machicote.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Machicote v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Close
Represented By: Jonathan M. Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Walmer, M.D.
Represented By: Jonathan M. Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Jo Salamon
Represented By: Jonathan M. Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Smith
Represented By: Jonathan M. Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Lee Machicote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?