France v. Bernstein
Petitioner: Todd France
Respondent: Jason Bernstein
Case Number: 1:2020cv01443
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 59 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #58 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Sur-Reply (and supporting memorandum of law) filed by Todd France.(Clements, William)
September 16, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Sur-Reply (and supporting memorandum of law) by Jason Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - proposed Sur-Sur-Reply)(Comerford, John)
September 3, 2020 Filing 57 SUR REPLY to REPLY to Response to Motion re #44 MOTION to Vacate filed by Todd France. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5)(Clements, William)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER - AND NOW, on this 27th day of August 2020, upon consideration of Petitioner Todd France (Petitioner)s motion for leave to file a sur-reply brief (Doc. No. 48) in connection with the pending motion to vacate the arbitration award filed by Respondent Jason Bernstein (Respondent) (Doc. No. 27), and noting Respondents opposition thereto (Doc. No. 55), IT IS ORDERED THAT Petitioners motion (Doc. No. #48 ) is GRANTED, and Petitioner may file a sur-reply brief in accordance with all applicable Local Rules of this Court within seven (7) days of the date of this Order.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 8/27/20. (dmn)
August 19, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc. 52 deleted and refiled as Doc. 55. (pjr)
August 19, 2020 Filing 55 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #48 MOTION For Leave to File Sur-Reply, #44 MOTION to Vacate filed by Jason Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Maxim email of July 15, 2020, #2 Exhibit(s) Iaconelli email of July 16, 2020 agreeing to Silver deposition, #3 Exhibit(s) Proof of service of Silver subpoena, #4 Exhibit(s) Maxim email of June 11, 2020, #5 Exhibit(s) Clements email of June 11, 2020)(Grenoble, Scott)
August 19, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioners, James Martin, John Comerford and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
August 19, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to refile Doc. 52 using the event: Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Responses and Replies (Briefs)- Brief in Opposition (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions). (pjr)
August 19, 2020 Filing 54 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Scott L. Grenoble on behalf of Jason Bernstein Attorney James Martin is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5213266.. (Grenoble, Scott)
August 19, 2020 Filing 53 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Scott L. Grenoble on behalf of Jason Bernstein Attorney John Comerford is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5213211.. (Grenoble, Scott)
August 17, 2020 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM for James Martin and John Comerford can be obtained at http://www.pamd.uscourts.gov/forms/petition-admission-practice. (pjr)
August 14, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by James B Martin on behalf of Jason Bernstein (Martin, James)
August 14, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by John D Comerford on behalf of Jason Bernstein (Comerford, John)
August 14, 2020 Filing 49 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #48 MOTION For Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Todd France. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(pjr)
August 14, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION For Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Todd France. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(pjr)
August 14, 2020 Filing 47 REPLY BRIEF re #44 MOTION to Vacate filed by Todd France. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R)(pjr)
August 14, 2020 Filing 46 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #44 MOTION to Vacate filed by Todd France. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(pjr)
August 14, 2020 Filing 45 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #44 MOTION to Vacate filed by Todd France. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(pjr)
August 14, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION to Vacate filed by Jason Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(pjr)
August 14, 2020 Filing 43 REPLY BRIEF re #40 MOTION for Confirmation of Arbitration Award filed by Todd France. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(pjr)
August 14, 2020 Filing 42 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #40 MOTION for Confirmation of Arbitration Award filed by Jason Bernstein.(pjr)
August 14, 2020 Filing 41 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #40 MOTION for Confirmation of Arbitration Award filed by Todd France.(pjr)
August 14, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Confirmation of Arbitration Award filed by Todd France. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(pjr)
August 14, 2020 Filing 39 Case transferred electronically in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00479 containing electronic documents.
August 14, 2020 Case transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (shea) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 38 Notice of Hearing Date re #36 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Response to Respondent's Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award, #37 Memorandum in Support (Folds, John) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 37 Memorandum in Support re #36 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Response to Respondent's Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award filed by Todd France. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Folds, John) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Response to Respondent's Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award by Todd France. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Folds, John) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Vacate #1 Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration,, MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD Doc. 1-16 filed by Jason Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit R)(Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 34 Memorandum in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Vacate #1 Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration,, MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD Doc. 1-16 filed by Todd France. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Folds, John) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
July 5, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE by Jason Bernstein re #27 MOTION to Vacate #1 Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration,, MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD Doc. 1-16 NOTICE OF SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. ORDERED that the time for Plaintiff to respond to the motion to vacate is EXTENDED toand including July 14, 2020; and it is further ORDERED that the time for Defendant to file his reply to Plaintiff's response is EXTENDED to and including July 24, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 07/02/20. (cmar, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 31 Notice of Hearing Date re #27 MOTION to Vacate #1 Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration,, MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD Doc. 1-16 (Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 30 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 MOTION to Vacate #1 Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration,, MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD Doc. 1-16 by Jason Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 29 Request for Hearing by Jason Bernstein re #27 MOTION to Vacate #1 Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration,, MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD Doc. 1-16 (Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 28 Memorandum in Support re #27 MOTION to Vacate #1 Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration,, MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD Doc. 1-16 filed by Jason Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Vacate #1 Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration,, MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD Doc. 1-16 by Jason Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or to Stay or Transfer filed by Jason Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 25 Opposition to #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or to Stay or Transfer filed by Todd France. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Folds, John) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 24 Consent MOTION to Continue Hearing by Todd France. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Folds, John) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Support re #5 MOTION for Confirmation of Arbitration Award Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Petitioner's Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Todd France. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Folds, John) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Pro hac vice for James B. Martin. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 5/20/20. (acha, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Pro hac vice for John D. Comerford. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 5/20/2020. (acha, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 20 Request for Hearing by Jason Bernstein re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or to Stay or Transfer (Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 19 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James B. Martin and Certification of Local Counsel Craig C. Reilly Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7208193. by Jason Bernstein. (Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 18 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John D. Comerford and Certification of Local Counsel Craig C. Reilly Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7208184. by Jason Bernstein. (Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Continue Hearing Now Set for June 5, 2020 (Doc. 13) by Jason Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 16 Memorandum in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Confirmation of Arbitration Award filed by Jason Bernstein. (Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 15 Memorandum in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or to Stay or Transfer filed by Jason Bernstein. (Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or to Stay or Transfer by Jason Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Hearing Date re #5 MOTION for Confirmation of Arbitration Award (Folds, John) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - THIS MATTER is before the Court on the consent motion filed by Defendant, Jason Bernstein, seeking an extension of time (i) for Defendant to respond to the pending motion to confirm an arbitration award filed by Plaintiff (Doc. #5 ), and (ii) for Plaintiff to file his reply to Defendant's response. Upon consideration of the motion, and there being no opposition to therelief sought, it is hereby ORDERED that the time for Defendant to respond is EXTENDED to and including May 18, 2020; and it is further ORDERED that the time for Plaintiff to file his reply to Defendant's response is EXTENDED to and including May 28, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 05/11/20. (cmar, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION for Confirmation of Arbitration Award by Jason Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice Michael Anthony Iaconelli. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 5/5/2020. (acha, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice for William Joseph Clements. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 5/5/2020. (acha, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Crandall Reilly on behalf of Jason Bernstein (Reilly, Craig) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William Joseph Clements and Certification of Local Counsel John David Folds Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7186634. by Todd France. (Folds, John) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Anthony Iaconelli and Certification of Local Counsel John David Folds Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7186611. by Todd France. (Folds, John) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Confirmation of Arbitration Award by Todd France. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memo in Support of Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration Award, #2 Proposed Order)(Folds, John) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd France Jason Bernstein served on 4/27/2020, answer due 5/18/2020 (Folds, John) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jason Bernstein. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration,, by Todd France. (Folds, John) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Confirmation of Arbitration Todd France v. Jason Bernstein ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7176815.), filed by Todd France. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1a, #2 Exhibit 1b, #3 Exhibit 1c, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5a, #8 Exhibit 5b, #9 Exhibit 5c, #10 Exhibit 6a, #11 Exhibit 6b, #12 Exhibit 6c, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9, #16 Exhibit 10, #17 Civil Cover Sheet)(Folds, John) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 8/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: France v. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jason Bernstein
Represented By: John D Comerford
Represented By: James B Martin
Represented By: Craig Crandall Reilly
Represented By: Scott L. Grenoble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Todd France
Represented By: John David Folds
Represented By: Craig Crandall Reilly
Represented By: William J. Clements
Represented By: Michael A. Iaconelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?