Ali v. Kauffman et al
Plaintiff: Suliman Ali
Defendant: Connie Green and K. Kauffman
Case Number: 1:2020cv01462
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MA
Referring Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Conditions)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Suliman Ali. (bg)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, including certification, by Suliman Ali.(bg) Modified on 10/8/2020 (lp).
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 Supplement by Suliman Ali to #1 Complaint (Lodged No FF and No Motion for IFP Filed). (bg)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 Letter filed by Suliman Ali re six month print out and lock down. (bg)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 08/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 New Prisoner Pack) (lp)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Suliman Ali.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali v. Kauffman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Kauffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suliman Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?