Mohammed v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Abdul Kadri Mohammed
Respondent: Simona Flores-Lund, Chad Wolf, William P. Barr and Clair Doll
Case Number: 1:2020cv01557
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Martin C Carlson
Referring Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainees
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Petition be DISMISSED as moot. Objections to R&R due by 10/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 2, 2020. (kjn)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by William P. Barr, Clair Doll, Simona Flores-Lund, Chad Wolf by William P. Barr, Clair Doll, Simona Flores-Lund, Chad Wolf. (Sanderson, Joanne)
September 14, 2020 VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING Case reassigned to Honorable Christopher C. Conner and referred to Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson as one or more parties have not consented to the jurisdiction of a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (jkc)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to William P. Barr, Clair Doll, Simona Flores-Lund, Abdul Kadri Mohammed, Chad Wolf YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 10/13/2020. (kjn)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Respondents may file a response to the courts order to show cause on or before October 5, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on September 10, 2020. (kjn)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response by William P. Barr, Clair Doll, Simona Flores-Lund, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sanderson, Joanne)
September 3, 2020 Receipt of payment from ABDUL MOHAMMED in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 9/2/2020. Receipt number 333072789 processed by aoswald. (jjs)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of PWHC and OSC RECEIVED from USAO. (kjn)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Respondents shall show cause on or before September 25, 2020 why thepetitioner should not be granted habeas corpus relief. Petitioner shall, if he so desires, file a reply to the response no later than October 9, 2020. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of the petition and this Order on theUnited States Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on September 2, 2020. (kjn)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 333072789. Petition is now deemed FILED. (ao)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 (THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER) directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed.Signed by LP on 8/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (Habeas))(mfa)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED. (mfa)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Abdul Kadri Mohammed.(mfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohammed v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Abdul Kadri Mohammed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Simona Flores-Lund
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Clair Doll
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?