Shaw et al v. Liu et al
Plaintiff: Scott Shaw and Ashley Shaw
Defendant: Kenneth C. Liu, M.D. and The Milton S. Hershey Medical Center
Case Number: 1:2020cv01860
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Jennifer P Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel to the Hon. Jennifer P. Wilson. (Weiss, Sol)
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene P. Feeney on behalf of The Milton S. Hershey Medical Center (Feeney, Eugene)
October 20, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by The Milton S. Hershey Medical Center. The Milton S. Hershey Medical Center waiver sent on 10/9/2020, answer due 12/8/2020. (McBride, Ryan)
October 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan R. McBride on behalf of The Milton S. Hershey Medical Center (McBride, Ryan)
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Kenneth C. Liu, MD. Kenneth C. Liu, MD waiver sent on 10/9/2020, answer due 12/8/2020. (Parker, Wiley)
October 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Wiley P. Parker on behalf of Kenneth C. Liu, MD (Parker, Wiley)
October 14, 2020 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson. (ve)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr)
October 9, 2020 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM for Stephen Pokiniewski, Jr. & Joseph Disandro can be obtained at http://www.pamd.uscourts.gov/forms/petition-admission-practice. (pjr)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kenneth C. Liu, MD, The Milton S. Hershey Medical Center ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number APAMDC-5289372), filed by Scott Shaw, Ashley Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate, #3 Certificate, #4 Exhibit(s))(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw et al v. Liu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth C. Liu, M.D.
Represented By: Wiley P. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Milton S. Hershey Medical Center
Represented By: Eugene P. Feeney
Represented By: Ryan R. McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Shaw
Represented By: Stephen J. Pokiniewski, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph P. Disandro
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: James R. Ronca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Shaw
Represented By: Stephen J. Pokiniewski, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph P. Disandro
Represented By: Sol H. Weiss
Represented By: James R. Ronca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?