Woolley v. Groft
Plaintiff: Mark E. Woolley
Defendant: Michael Groft
Case Number: 1:2020cv01887
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc. 15 deleted and refiled as Doc. 16. (pjr)
November 30, 2020 Filing 16 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #9 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Mark E. Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fritzinger, Arthur)
November 30, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to refile Doc. 15 using the event: Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Responses and Replies (Briefs)- Brief in Opposition (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions). (pjr)
November 18, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Leigh Ann Benson on behalf of Mark E. Woolley (Benson, Leigh)
November 16, 2020 Filing 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #9 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Michael Groft. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Service)(Adonizio, Peter)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - AND SO, on this 16th day of November 2020, upon consideration of Plaintiffs motion for entry of default (Doc. No. #5 ), IT IS ORDERED THAT the motion is DENIED. See Order for details. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 11/16/20 (dmn)
November 13, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Order by Michael Groft. #8 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion . (Bradshaw, Mark)
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Order by Michael Groft. #9 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . (Bradshaw, Mark)
November 13, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Michael Groft. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Bradshaw, Mark)
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Michael Groft.(Bradshaw, Mark)
November 13, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to refile Document 5 as a Request for default. Also, please provide Proposed Order for Clerk's signature. (aaa)
November 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Bradshaw on behalf of Michael Groft (Bradshaw, Mark)
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Michael Groft. Michael Groft waiver sent on 10/15/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (Bradshaw, Mark)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Entry of Default by Mark E. Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex.A)(Fritzinger, Arthur)
October 21, 2020 Filing 4 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 10/21/20. (dmn)
October 21, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Michael Groft on 10-16-2020, filed by Mark E. Woolley. (Fritzinger, Arthur)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Michael Groft and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Groft ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number APAMDC-5294776), filed by Mark E. Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 2, #4 3, #5 4, #6 5)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woolley v. Groft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark E. Woolley
Represented By: Arthur P. Fritzinger
Represented By: Leigh Ann Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Groft
Represented By: Mark D. Bradshaw
Represented By: Peter J Adonizio, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?