Schindler Elevator Corporation v. Murolet IP LLC
Plaintiff: Schindler Elevator Corporation
Defendant: Murolet IP LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02079
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2021 01:30 PM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 12/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Term. Calendar)(mw)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - is hereby ORDERED: The Concurred Motion to Extend Time to Respond to the Courts December 21, 2020 Order that Defendant Murolets attorneys of record at Goldberg Segalla show cause by 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday December 23, 2020 is GRANTED. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 12/23/2020 (mw)
December 23, 2020 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief to #24 Order on Motion to Expedite,, #21 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Goldberg Segalla filed by Murolet IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stadelman, Sean)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - The motion (Doc. #22 ) to expedite review is GRANTED. Briefing on the motion (Doc. 16) to dismiss is STAYED pending resolution of the motion (Doc. 21) to disqualify. Murolet attorneys of record at Goldberg Segalla shall show cause on or before 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, December 23, 2020, why they should not be disqualified from the above-captioned matter for violating Rule 1.7 of the Pennsylvania Rules of Professional Conduct. Schindler may file a reply brief on or before 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, December 30, 2020. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 12/21/2020 (mw)
December 18, 2020 Filing 23 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #22 MOTION to Expedite Review and Disposition of Its Motion to Disqualify (Dkt. 21), #21 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Goldberg Segalla filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation.(Montgomery, Bridget)
December 18, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Expedite Review and Disposition of Its Motion to Disqualify (Dkt. 21) by Schindler Elevator Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Montgomery, Bridget)
December 18, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Goldberg Segalla by Schindler Elevator Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Matthew Schultz, Esquire, #3 Declaration of Jon W. Gurka)(Montgomery, Bridget)
December 16, 2020 Filing 20 DECLARATION by Schindler Elevator Corporation re #19 Brief in Opposition to Murolet IP LLC's Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 7)(Montgomery, Bridget)
December 16, 2020 Filing 19 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation.(Montgomery, Bridget)
December 2, 2020 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Murolet IP LLC. (Stadelman, Sean)
December 2, 2020 Filing 17 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Murolet IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Daignault Declaration, #2 Exhibit(s) Daignault 1, #3 Exhibit(s) Daignault 2, #4 Exhibit(s) Daignault 3, #5 Exhibit(s) Daignault 4, #6 Declaration Bernstein Declaration)(Stadelman, Sean)
December 2, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Murolet IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stadelman, Sean)
November 16, 2020 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Schindler Elevator Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Schindler Enterprises, Inc., Corporate Parent Schindler Holding Ltd. for Schindler Elevator Corporation. (Gurka, Jon)
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Karl Kowallis. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/16/2020. (tw)
November 16, 2020 Filing 13 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Jon W. Gurka. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/16/2020. (tw)
November 16, 2020 Filing 12 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Joseph S. Cianfrani. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/16/2020. (tw)
November 16, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioners Joseph Cianfrani, Jon Gurka and Karl Kowallis and associate counsel bar status verified (mw)
November 13, 2020 Filing 11 Code of Professional Conduct signed by Karl Kowallis, by Schindler Elevator Corporation. Docket Annotation . (Kowallis, Karl)
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 Code of Professional Conduct signed by Joseph S. Cianfrani, by Schindler Elevator Corporation. Docket Annotation . (Cianfrani, Joseph)
November 13, 2020 Filing 9 Code of Professional Conduct signed by Jon W. Gurka, by Schindler Elevator Corporation. Docket Annotation . (Gurka, Jon)
November 12, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorneys Joseph Cianfrani, Jon Gurka and Karl Kowallis are advised to file a code of professional conduct to accompany their petitions for special admission. Refile as document filed, do not refile the petition (mw)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/12/2020. (tw)
November 11, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Schindler Elevator Corporation. Murolet IP LLC served on 11/11/2020, answer due 12/2/2020. (Montgomery, Bridget)
November 11, 2020 Filing 6 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Karl W Kowallis on behalf of Schindler Elevator Corporation Attorney Karl Kowallis is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5338290.. (Kowallis, Karl)
November 11, 2020 Filing 5 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Jon W. Gurka on behalf of Schindler Elevator Corporation Attorney Jon Gurka is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5338258.. (Gurka, Jon)
November 11, 2020 Filing 4 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Joseph S. Cianfrani on behalf of Schindler Elevator Corporation Attorney Joseph Cianfrani is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number BPAMDC-5338235.. (Cianfrani, Joseph)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an actionPATENT. (rw)
November 10, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Murolet IP LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (rw)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Murolet IP LLC ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number APAMDC-5335035), filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schindler Elevator Corporation v. Murolet IP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murolet IP LLC
Represented By: Sean T. Stadelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schindler Elevator Corporation
Represented By: Bridget E. Montgomery
Represented By: Jon W. Gurka
Represented By: Joseph S. Cianfrani
Represented By: Karl W Kowallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?