BYERS et al v. FINISHING SYSTEMS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Cody King, Samuel L. Smith, Savannah D. Byers, Mike Rowles, Cynthia L. Barnes, Cody Ash, Dylan Aldridge, Tim Adams and Walter P. Buryk, III
Defendant: Carlisle Fluid Technologies, Jim Dorton Contracting, Graco Inc., Airgas Safety, Inc., Abc Corporations (A-Z), Finishing Systems, Inc., Abc Corporation A-F, Sames Kremlin, Inc., John and Jane Does, Schweitzer & Crosson, Inc., Global Finishing Solutions, LLC, Mi-Kee-Tro Metal Manufacturing, Inc., Grapek Company, Edwin L. Heim Co., Firestop Solutions, Inc., Bfpe International, Inc., Schaedler/Yesco Distribution, Inc., SCM Construction LLC, Amerex Fire International, Inc. and Amerex Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv02110
Filed: November 10, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Jennifer P Wilson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Filing 244 ANSWER to Complaint Crossclaim of Amerex by Edwin L. Heim Co..(Poore, Jason)
December 31, 2020 Filing 243 Reply of Global Finishing Solutions, LLC to Crossclaim of Defendant Amerex ANSWER to Complaint by Global Finishing Solutions, LLC.(Pope, Elizabeth)
December 30, 2020 Filing 242 Mail sent to Matthew Vodzak, document #206 , Returned as Undeliverable. Envelope marked "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed" (rw)
December 23, 2020 Filing 241 REPLY by Graco Inc.. to #220 Response to Crossclaims of Amerex Corporation. (Kunsch, John)
December 22, 2020 Filing 240 RESPONSE by Bfpe International, Inc. to New Matter Crossclaim of Amerex Corporation. (Sotland, Jeffrey)
December 22, 2020 Filing 239 Answer of Defendant Airgas Safety, Inc. to Crossclaim of Defendant Amerex Corporation (ECF 220) ANSWER to Complaint by Airgas Safety, Inc..(Taranto, Damian)
December 21, 2020 Filing 238 REPLY by Finishing Systems, Inc.. to #220 Response to Crossclaims of Amerex Corporation. (McCarroll, Scott)
December 18, 2020 Filing 237 ANSWER to #161 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, SCM CONSTRUCTION, LLCS CROSSCLAIMS by Airgas Safety, Inc..(Taranto, Damian)
December 18, 2020 Filing 236 ANSWER to #179 Answer to Complaint,,, Crossclaim,, ANSWER TO DEFENDANT, SCHAEDLER/YESCO DISTRIBUTION, INC.S CROSSCLAIMS by Airgas Safety, Inc..(Taranto, Damian)
December 18, 2020 Filing 235 ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, ANSWER TO DEFENDANT, SAMES KREMLIN, INC.S CROSSCLAIMS by Airgas Safety, Inc..(Taranto, Damian)
December 18, 2020 Filing 234 REPLY by Mi-Kee-Tro Metal Manufacturing, Inc.. to #220 Response of Defendant Amerex Corporation. (Campbell, Andrew)
December 18, 2020 Filing 233 ANSWER to #179 Answer to Complaint,,, Crossclaim,, by Amerex Corporation.(Wolfson, Brett)
December 18, 2020 Filing 232 ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, by Amerex Corporation.(Wolfson, Brett)
December 18, 2020 Filing 231 ANSWER to #161 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, by Amerex Corporation.(Wolfson, Brett)
December 18, 2020 Filing 230 ANSWER to #121 Answer to Complaint,,, Crossclaim,, by Amerex Corporation.(Wolfson, Brett)
December 18, 2020 Filing 229 ANSWER to #114 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Amerex Corporation.(Wolfson, Brett)
December 18, 2020 Filing 228 ANSWER to #98 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Amerex Corporation.(Wolfson, Brett)
December 18, 2020 Filing 227 ANSWER to #26 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Amerex Corporation.(Wolfson, Brett)
December 17, 2020 Filing 226 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen E Purcell on behalf of Global Finishing Solutions, LLC. (Purcell, Stephen)
December 17, 2020 Filing 225 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Amanda C. Steffy, Esquire. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 12/17/2020. (ve)
December 17, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner and associate counsel bar status verified. (rw)
December 16, 2020 Filing 224 RESPONSE by Jim Dorton Contracting to #220 Response ...Cross-Claim of Amerex. (Barnes, Adam)
December 16, 2020 Filing 223 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Amanda Steffy on behalf of Jim Dorton Contracting Attorney Amanda C. Steffy is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5391455.. (Steffy, Amanda)
December 16, 2020 Filing 222 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Gretchen J. Fitzer, Esq. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 12/16/2020. (ve)
December 16, 2020 Filing 221 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Gretchen Fitzer on behalf of Jim Dorton Contracting Attorney Gretchen J. Fitzer is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5391159.. (Fitzer, Gretchen)
December 16, 2020 Filing 220 RESPONSE by Amerex Corporation to #3 Amended Complaint . (Wolfson, Brett)
December 16, 2020 Filing 219 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia A Morrison on behalf of Finishing Systems, Inc. (Morrison, Julia)
December 16, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner and associate counsel bar status verified. (rw)
December 14, 2020 Filing 218 NOTICE by Savannah D. Byers (Fellmeth, Scott)
December 11, 2020 Filing 217 STIPULATION re #3 Amended Complaint by Grapek Company. (Kemether, Sean)
December 11, 2020 Filing 216 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Damian M. Taranto, Esq. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 12/11/2020. (ve)
December 11, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Damian Taranto, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
December 10, 2020 Filing 215 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Damian M. Taranto on behalf of Airgas Safety, Inc. Attorney Damian Taranto is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5383462., filed by on behalf of Airgas Safety, Inc..(Taranto, Damian)
December 10, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Taranto is reminded to re-file #210 Petition for Special Admission using the event: Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice. (ve)
December 7, 2020 Filing 214 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Shawn M. Raiter, Esq.Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 12/7/2020. (ve)
December 7, 2020 Filing 213 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Elizabeth Mande Hines, Esq.Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 12/7/2020. (ve)
December 7, 2020 Filing 212 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by John Michael Kunsch on behalf of Graco Inc. Attorney Shawn M. Raiter is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5375950.. (Kunsch, John)
December 7, 2020 Filing 211 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Stephen M. McManus on behalf of SCM Construction LLC, SCM Construction LLC Attorney Elizabeth Mande Hines is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5375863.. (McManus, Stephen)
December 7, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Bar status verified for petitioner and local counsel as to documents #211 & #212 . (rw)
December 4, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to refile Document 210 as a Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice. This event is located under Other Documents. There is a filing fee of $50. (aaa)
December 3, 2020 Filing 210 Petition Application for Admission to Practice in this Court , filed by Airgas Safety, Inc..(Taranto, Damian)
December 3, 2020 Filing 209 Application for Admission to Practice in this Court of Shawn M. Raiter, Esquire. (Kunsch, John)
December 3, 2020 Filing 208 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Scott A. Fellmeth, Esquire.Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 12/3/2020. (ve)
December 3, 2020 Filing 207 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to George D. Bogris, Esquire. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 12/3/2020. (ve)
December 2, 2020 Filing 206 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 12/2/2020. (ve)
December 1, 2020 Filing 204 Motion to Dismiss. (Vodzak, Matthew)
December 1, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioners, Scott Fellmeth,George Bogris, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
November 30, 2020 Filing 203 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Jeffrey C. Sotland on behalf of Bfpe International, Inc. Attorney George Bogris is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5365573.. (Sotland, Jeffrey)
November 30, 2020 Filing 202 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Global Finishing Solutions, LLC. (Pope, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2020 Filing 201 Response to New Matter Crossclaim of Schaedler/Yesco ANSWER to #179 Answer to Complaint,,, Crossclaim,, by Bfpe International, Inc..(Sotland, Jeffrey)
November 30, 2020 Filing 200 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Scott A. Fellmeth on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Scott A. Fellmeth is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5365052.. (Fellmeth, Scott)
November 24, 2020 Filing 199 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Savannah D. Byers. (Pantano, Adam)
November 23, 2020 Filing 198 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by SCM Construction LLC. (McManus, Stephen)
November 19, 2020 Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Gabriel on behalf of Firestop Solutions, Inc. (Gabriel, Anthony)
November 17, 2020 Filing 196 Reply/ ANSWER to #179 Answer to Complaint,,, Crossclaim,, of Defendant, Schaedler/Yesco Distribution, Inc. by Global Finishing Solutions, LLC.(Pope, Elizabeth)
November 17, 2020 Filing 195 ANSWER to #161 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, of Defendant, Schadler/Yesco Distribution, Inc. by Global Finishing Solutions, LLC.(Pope, Elizabeth)
November 17, 2020 Filing 194 CIVIL PRACTICE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 11/17/2020. (ve)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 193 SCHEDULING ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT: The initial case management conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 will be conducted via telephone by the court on December 1, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. The parties shall call-in to the conference call number 877-336-1828 using the access code 2529544. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 11/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Calendar)(ve)
November 17, 2020 Filing 192 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson. (ve)
November 17, 2020 Filing 191 ANSWER to #179 Answer to Complaint,,, Crossclaim,, by Graco Inc..(Kunsch, John)
November 13, 2020 Filing 190 RESPONSE by Jim Dorton Contracting to #179 Answer to Complaint,,, Crossclaim,, of Schaedler/Yesco. (Barnes, Adam)
November 13, 2020 Filing 189 STIPULATION by Firestop Solutions, Inc.. (Kroll, Rolf)
November 13, 2020 Filing 188 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 5:20-cv-03207 containing electronic documents.
November 13, 2020 Case Statistical Entry: Case Assigned to Judge Wilson (ep)
October 27, 2020 Filing 187 Response of Defendant, Global Finishing Solutions, LLC to the Crossclaim of Defendant Schaedler/Yesco Distribution, Inc. by GLOBAL FINISHING SOLUTIONS, LLC. (UNDERWOOD, ELIZABETH) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
October 27, 2020 Filing 186 Response to Crossclaim re #179 Answer to Complaint,,, Crossclaim,, by FINISHING SYSTEMS, INC.. (MCCARROLL, SCOTT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
October 27, 2020 Filing 185 Response Opposition to Crossclaim of Defendant, SCM Construcftion, LLC by GLOBAL FINISHING SOLUTIONS, LLC. (UNDERWOOD, ELIZABETH) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
October 26, 2020 Filing 184 Response to Co-Defendant Schaedler/Yesco Distribution, Inc.'s Cross-Claim, by EDWIN L. HEIM CO.. (REINHART, MICHELLE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
October 21, 2020 Copy of #181 Memorandum and #182 Order mailed to Unreps. (mas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 183 Disclosures Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) with Certificate of Service by GRAPEK COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(KEMETHER, SEAN) Modified on 10/21/2020 (tjd). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER THAT PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(A), IT IS IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE AND BEST INTEREST OF THE PARTIES THAT THIS CASE BE TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA; AND ALL MOTIONS IN THIS MATTER ARE TO BE ADDRESSED BY THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 10/8/20. 10/8/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 181 MEMORANDUM OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 10/8/20. 10/8/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 180 Response re #179 Answer to Complaint,,, Crossclaim,, by MI-KEE-TRO METAL MANUFACTURING, INC.. (CAMPBELL, ANDREW) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 179 ANSWER to Complaint Amended with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against AIRGAS SAFETY, INC., AMEREX CORPORATION, AMEREX FIRE INTERNATIONAL, INC., BFPE INTERNATIONAL, INC., CARLISLE FLUID TECHNOLOGIES, EDWIN L. HEIM CO., FINISHING SYSTEMS, INC., FIRESTOP SOLUTIONS, INC., GLOBAL FINISHING SOLUTIONS, LLC, GRACO INC., GRAPEK COMPANY, JIM DORTON CONTRACTING, MI-KEE-TRO METAL MANUFACTURING, INC., SAMES KREMLIN, INC., SCHWEITZER & CROSSON, INC., SCM CONSTRUCTION LLC by SCHAEDLER/YESCO DISTRIBUTION, INC..(MORAN, PATRICK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER NO. 178 HAS BEEN MAILED TO UNREPS, AMEREX FIRE INTERNATIONAL, INC.; FIRESTOP SOLUTIONS, INC.; SCHAEDLER/YESCO DISTRIBUTION, INC. AND SCM CONSTRUCTION LLC. (bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER OF 10/5/20 THAT THE APPLICATION OF GEORGE D. BOGRIS, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED., ATTORNEY GEORGE D. BOGRIS for BFPE INTERNATIONAL, INC. ADDED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 10/5/20. 10/6/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (COPY NOT MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES)(dt, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 177 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF 10/5/20 THAT ALL CLAIMS OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES MADE BY PLAINTIFFS AS ALLEGED AGAINST DEFENDANT AMEREX CORPORATION IN THE AMENDED COMPLAINT ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 10/5/20. 10/5/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED, COPIES MAILED TO UNREP PARTY. (dt, ) Modified on 10/5/2020 (dt, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 176 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF 10/5/20 THAT ALL REFERENCES TO, AND/OR CLAIMS FOR,PUNITIVE DAMAGES, GROSS NEGLIGENCE, RECKLESSNESS, AND OUTRAGEOUS ACTS, WITH RESPECT TO DEFENDANT, SCHWEITZER & CROSSON, INC., ARE STRICKEN AND DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 10/5/20. 10/5/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED COPIES MAILED TO UNREP PARTY. (DT) Modified on 10/5/2020 (dt, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
October 5, 2020 Filing 175 Response of Defendant Edwin L. Heim Company to Co-Defendant Sames Kremlin, Inc.'s Cross-Claim re #163 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, by EDWIN L. HEIM CO.. (REINHART, MICHELLE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
October 5, 2020 Filing 174 Response of Defendant Edwin L. Heim Company to Co-Defendant SCM Construction, LLC's Cross-Claim re #161 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by EDWIN L. HEIM CO.. (REINHART, MICHELLE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Filing 173 Disclosure by SCHWEITZER & CROSSON, INC..(SPERLING, WARREN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 172 Reply to Cross Claims of Defendant Sames Kremlin, Inc., by GLOBAL FINISHING SOLUTIONS, LLC.(FARRELL, JOHN) Modified on 9/23/2020 (md, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 171 Response to Crossclaims of SCM Construction by GRACO INC.. (KUNSCH, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 170 ANSWER to #161 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by FINISHING SYSTEMS, INC..(MCCARROLL, SCOTT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 169 ANSWER to #163 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, by FINISHING SYSTEMS, INC..(MCCARROLL, SCOTT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 168 Response to New Matter Crossclaims of Sames Kremlin, Inc. by BFPE INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (SOTLAND, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 167 Response re #163 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, of Sames Kremlin, Inc. by JIM DORTON CONTRACTING. (BARNES, ADAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 166 Response re #161 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by MI-KEE-TRO METAL MANUFACTURING, INC.. (CAMPBELL, ANDREW) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 165 Response re #163 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, by MI-KEE-TRO METAL MANUFACTURING, INC.. (CAMPBELL, ANDREW) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 164 Response re #161 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of SCM Construction LLC by JIM DORTON CONTRACTING. (BARNES, ADAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 163 Defendant Sames Kremlin, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 13(g) and Omnibus Replies to all Crossclaims Asserted Against it by all Defendants and/or Third Party Defendants with Certificate of Service against All Defendants by SAMES KREMLIN, INC..(BRONSTEIN, DAVID) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 162 Response to New Matter Crossclaims of SCM Construction, LLC by BFPE INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (SOTLAND, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 161 ANSWER to Complaint together with to plaintiffs' Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by SCM CONSTRUCTION LLC, SCM CONSTRUCTION LLC.(MCMANUS, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 14, 2020 DOC. 160 MAILED TO UNREP. (sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT BY AND BETWEEN COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS AND COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT CARLISLE FLUID TECHNOLOGIES, INC., THAT ALL REFERENCES TO, AND/OR CLAIMS FOR, PUNITIVE DAMAGES, GROSS NEGLIGENCE, RECKLESSNESS, AND OUTRAGEOUS ACTS, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THOSE CONTAINED IN THE NEGLIGENCE CLAIM OF COUNT XII, THE CLAIMS OF NEGLIGENT INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS OF COUNTS XXV, XXVI, XXVTT, XXVTTI, XXIX, XXX, THE WRONGFUL DEATH CLAIMS OF COUNTS XXXI AND XXXTT, AND THE SURVIVAL CLAIMS OF COUNTS XXXTTT AND XXXTV, AS WELL AS PARAGRAPHS 308, 309, 314, 519, 522-27, 534-39, 543, 547, AND THE AD DAMNUM CLAUSES OF PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT, WITH RESPECT TO DEFENDANT CARLISLE FLUID TECHNOLOGIES, ARE STRICKEN AND DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 9/10/20. 9/10/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 159 Response to Mi Kee Tro Metal Crossclaim by EDWIN L. HEIM CO.. (POORE, JASON) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 158 Response to Jim Dorton Contracting Crossclaim by EDWIN L. HEIM CO.. (POORE, JASON) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 157 Response to Graco Inc.'s Crossclaim by EDWIN L. HEIM CO.. (POORE, JASON) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 156 Response to Airgas Safety Crossclaim by EDWIN L. HEIM CO.. (POORE, JASON) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 155 RESPONSE in Opposition re #49 MOTION to Transfer Venue to U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania filed by TIM ADAMS, DYLAN ALDRIDGE, CODY ASH, CYNTHIA L. BARNES, WALTER P. BURYK, III, SAVANNAH D. BYERS, CODY KING, MIKE ROWLES, SAMUEL L. SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Opp to Global Motion to Transfer, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(FELLMETH, SCOTT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 154 RESPONSE in Opposition re #100 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SAVANNAH D. BYERS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Certificate of Service)(BENDESKY, LARRY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 3, 2020 Filing 153 Answer to Crossclaim by AIRGAS SAFETY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (FOWLER, JOSEPH) Modified on 9/7/2020 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 3, 2020 Filing 152 Answer to Crossclaim by AIRGAS SAFETY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (FOWLER, JOSEPH) Modified on 9/7/2020 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 3, 2020 Filing 151 Answer to Crossclaim by AIRGAS SAFETY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (FOWLER, JOSEPH) Modified on 9/7/2020 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 3, 2020 Filing 150 Answer to Crossclaim by AIRGAS SAFETY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (FOWLER, JOSEPH) Modified on 9/7/2020 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 3, 2020 Filing 149 ANSWER to #121 Answer to Complaint,,, Crossclaim,, by FINISHING SYSTEMS, INC..(MCCARROLL, SCOTT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 3, 2020 Filing 148 ANSWER to #114 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by FINISHING SYSTEMS, INC..(MCCARROLL, SCOTT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 147 Answer to #126 Mi-Kee-Tro Metal Manufacturing, Inc.'s Crossclaims by BFPE INTERNATIONAL, INC. (SOTLAND, JEFFREY) Modified on 9/3/2020 (tjd). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 146 Reply to #126 Cross Claim of Mi-Kee-Tro Metal Manufacturing, Inc. by GLOBAL FINISHING SOLUTIONS, LLC. (FARRELL, JOHN) Modified on 9/3/2020 (tjd). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. MORAN on behalf of SCHAEDLER/YESCO DISTRIBUTION, INC. with Jury Demand(MORAN, PATRICK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 144 Reply to #121 Cross Claim of Graco, Inc. by GLOBAL FINISHING SOLUTIONS, LLC. (FARRELL, JOHN) Modified on 9/3/2020 (tjd). Modified on 9/3/2020 (tjd). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 143 Response re #126 Answer to Complaint,,, Crossclaim,, of Mi-Kee-Tro Metal Manufacturing, Inc. by GRACO INC.. (KUNSCH, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 142 Response re #114 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Jim Dorton Contracting by GRACO INC.. (KUNSCH, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 141 Response re #98 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Airgas Safety, Inc. by GRACO INC.. (KUNSCH, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 140 Response re #26 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Grapek Company by GRACO INC.. (KUNSCH, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 139 Response re #126 Answer to Complaint,,, Crossclaim,, of Mi-Kee-Tro Metal Manufacturing, Inc. by JIM DORTON CONTRACTING. (BARNES, ADAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 138 ANSWER to #98 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by FINISHING SYSTEMS, INC..(MCCARROLL, SCOTT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 137 RESPONSE in Opposition re #86 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint in part filed by SAVANNAH D. BYERS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(BENDESKY, LARRY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 136 RESPONSE in Opposition re #83 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) filed by SAVANNAH D. BYERS. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Certificate of Service)(BENDESKY, LARRY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 135 Response to Crossclaims of Graco, Inc. by BFPE INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (SOTLAND, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 134 Reply to Cross Claims ANSWER to #121 Answer to Complaint,,, Crossclaim,, of Defendant, Graco, Inc., by GLOBAL FINISHING SOLUTIONS, LLC.(FARRELL, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 133 Response re #121 Answer to Complaint,,, Crossclaim,, of Graco Inc. by JIM DORTON CONTRACTING. (BARNES, ADAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 132 Response re #126 Answer to Complaint,,, Crossclaim,, OF MI-KEE-TRO by CARLISLE FLUID TECHNOLOGIES. (CAMPBELL, GLENN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 131 Response re #114 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim OF JIM DORTON CONTRACTING by CARLISLE FLUID TECHNOLOGIES. (CAMPBELL, GLENN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 130 Response re #121 Answer to Complaint,,, Crossclaim,, OF GRACO by CARLISLE FLUID TECHNOLOGIES. (CAMPBELL, GLENN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 129 Response to New Matter Crossclaim of Jim Dorton Contracting by MI-KEE-TRO METAL MANUFACTURING, INC.. (CAMPBELL, ANDREW) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 128 Response to New Matter Crossclaim of Graco Inc. by MI-KEE-TRO METAL MANUFACTURING, INC.. (CAMPBELL, ANDREW) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 127 Response to New Matter Crossclaim of Airgas Safety, Inc. by MI-KEE-TRO METAL MANUFACTURING, INC.. (CAMPBELL, ANDREW) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 126 Mi-Kee-Tro Metal Manufacturing, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against AIRGAS SAFETY, INC., AMEREX CORPORATION, AMEREX FIRE INTERNATIONAL, INC., BFPE INTERNATIONAL, INC., CARLISLE FLUID TECHNOLOGIES, EDWIN L. HEIM CO., FINISHING SYSTEMS, INC., FIRESTOP SOLUTIONS, INC., GLOBAL FINISHING SOLUTIONS, LLC, GRACO INC., GRAPEK COMPANY, JIM DORTON CONTRACTING, SAMES KREMLIN, INC., SCHAEDLER/YESCO DISTRIBUTION, INC., SCHWEITZER & CROSSON, INC., SCM CONSTRUCTION LLC by MI-KEE-TRO METAL MANUFACTURING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Granted Stip Plf and Def Mi-Kee-Tro)(CAMPBELL, ANDREW) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 26, 2020 Filing 125 Response re #98 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Airgas Safety, Inc. by JIM DORTON CONTRACTING. (BARNES, ADAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 26, 2020 Filing 124 Response in Opposition to Cross Claim of Airgas Safety, Inc., by GLOBAL FINISHING SOLUTIONS, LLC. (FARRELL, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 123 STIPULATION to Dismiss Claims for Punitive Damages, Recklessness and Gross Negligence by SCM CONSTRUCTION LLC, SCM CONSTRUCTION LLC. (MCMANUS, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 122 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SCM CONSTRUCTION LLC, SCM CONSTRUCTION LLC.(MCMANUS, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 121 Graco, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against AIRGAS SAFETY, INC., AMEREX CORPORATION, AMEREX FIRE INTERNATIONAL, INC., BFPE INTERNATIONAL, INC., CARLISLE FLUID TECHNOLOGIES, EDWIN L. HEIM CO., FINISHING SYSTEMS, INC., FIRESTOP SOLUTIONS, INC., GLOBAL FINISHING SOLUTIONS, LLC, GRAPEK COMPANY, JIM DORTON CONTRACTING, MI-KEE-TRO METAL MANUFACTURING, INC., SAMES KREMLIN, INC., SCHAEDLER/YESCO DISTRIBUTION, INC., SCHWEITZER & CROSSON, INC., SCM CONSTRUCTION LLC by GRACO INC..(KUNSCH, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 120 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by TIM ADAMS, DYLAN ALDRIDGE, CODY ASH, CYNTHIA L. BARNES, WALTER P. BURYK, III, SAVANNAH D. BYERS, CODY KING, MIKE ROWLES, SAMUEL L. SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(FELLMETH, SCOTT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 119 RESPONSE in Opposition re #56 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint in Part filed by TIM ADAMS, DYLAN ALDRIDGE, CODY ASH, CYNTHIA L. BARNES, WALTER P. BURYK, III, SAVANNAH D. BYERS, CODY KING, MIKE ROWLES, SAMUEL L. SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Opposition to Schweitzer & Crosson's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(FELLMETH, SCOTT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 118 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL Motion Hearing held on 08/24/20. Court Reporter: ESR. (dt, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 117 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by JIM DORTON CONTRACTING.(BARNES, ADAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 116 STIPULATION to Dismiss Claims for Punitive Damages, Recklessness and Gross Negligence as to Graco, Inc. by GRACO INC.. (KUNSCH, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT BY AND AMONG THE UNDERSIGNED COUNSEL THAT SAMES KREMLIN, INC. HAS UNTIL SEPTEMBER 15, 2020 TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT. NO PRIOR EXTENSIONS HAVE BEEN REQUESTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/20/20. 8/24/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Mailed Doc. 87, 101, 102, 103, 104, 105, 106, 107, 108, 109, 110, 111, 112, 115 to Unreps. (er, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 114 ANSWER to Complaint Amended [Doc. #3], Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by JIM DORTON CONTRACTING.(BARNES, ADAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 113 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT by SCM CONSTRUCTION LLC, SCM CONSTRUCTION LLC.** (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)** (MCMANUS, STEPHEN) Modified on 8/24/2020 (tjd). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT BY AND BETWEEN COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS AND COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT, JIM DORTON CONTRACTING, THAT ALL REFERENCES TO, AND/OR CLAIMS FOR, PUNITIVE DAMAGES, GROSS NEGLIGENCE, RECKLESSNESS, AND OUTRAGEOUS ACTS, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THOSE CONTAINED IN THE NEGLIGENCE CLAIM OF COUNT V, THE CLAIMS OF NEGLIGENT INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS OF COUNTS XXV, XXVI, XXVII, XXVIII, XXIX, XXX, THE WRONGFUL DEATH CLAIMS OF COUNTS XXXI AND XXXII, AND THE SURVIVAL CLAIMS OF COUNTS XXXIII AND XXXIV, AS WELL AS PARAGRAPHS 242 AND 243, AND THE AD DAMNUM CLAUSES OF PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT, WITH RESPECT TO DEFENDANT, JIM DORTON CONTRACTING, ARE STRICKEN AND DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/21/20. 8/21/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7.4, PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT, AIRGAS SAFETY, INC. (AIRGAS) HEREBY STIPULATE AND AGREE THAT ALL REFERENCES TO, AND/OR CLAIMS FOR, PUNITIVE DAMAGES, GROSS NEGLIGENCE, RECKLESSNESS, AND OUTRAGEOUS ACTS, WITH RESPECT TO AIRGAS, ARE HEREBY STRICKEN AND DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/21/20. 8/21/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT BY AND BETWEEN COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS AND COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT MI-KEETRO METAL MANUFACTURING, INC., THAT ALL REFERENCES TO, AND/OR CLAIMS FOR, PUNITIVE DAMAGES, GROSS NEGLIGENCE, RECKLESSNESS, AND OUTRAGEOUS ACTS, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THOSE CONTAINED IN THE NEGLIGENCE CLAIM OF COUNT III, THE CLAIMS OF NEGLIGENT INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS OF COUNTS XXV, XXVI, XXVII, XXVIII, XXIX, XXX, THE WRONGFUL DEATH CLAIMS OF COUNTS XXXI AND XXXII, AND THE SURVIVAL CLAIMS OF COUNTS XXXIII AND XXXIV, AS WELL AS PARAGRAPHS 222, 223, 519, 522-27, 534-39, 543, 547, AND THE AD DAMNUM CLAUSES OF PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT, WITH RESPECT TO DEFENDANT MI-KEE-TRO METAL MANUFACTURING, INC., ARE STRICKEN AND DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/21/20. 8/21/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT BY AND AMONG THE UNDERSIGNED COUNSEL THAT SAMES KREMLIN, INC. HAS UNTIL SEPTEMBER 15, 2020 TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT. NO PRIOR EXTENSIONS HAVE BEEN REQUESTED; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/21/20. 8/21/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT BY AND BETWEEN COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS AND COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT, BFPE INTERNATIONAL, INC. THAT ALL REFERENCES TO, AND/OR CLAIMS FOR, PUNITIVE DAMAGES, GROSS NEGLIGENCE, RECKLESSNESS, OUTRAGEOUS ACTS, AND SUB-PART (GG) OF PARAGRAPH 373 WITH RESPECT TO DEFENDANT, BFPE INTERNATIONAL, INC. ARE STRICKEN AND DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/21/20. 8/21/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT BY AND AMONG THE UNDERSIGNED COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF THEIR RESPECTIVE PARTIES THAT ANY AND ALL CLAIMS FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES, RECKLESSNESS, AND GROSS NEGLIGENCE CONTAINED IN PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO SAMES KREMLIN, INC., ONLY; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/21/20. 8/21/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) (Main Document 107 replaced on 8/21/2020) (mas, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT BY AND BETWEEN COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS AND COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT, GLOBAL FINISHING SOLUTIONS, LLC, THAT ALL REFERENCES TO, AND/OR CLAIMS FOR, PUNITIVE DAMAGES, GROSS NEGLIGENCE, RECKLESSNESS, AND OUTRAGEOUS ACTS, WITH RESPECT TO DEFENDANT, GLOBAL FINISHING SOLUTIONS, LLC, ARE STRICKEN AND DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/21/20. 8/21/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT BY AND BETWEEN COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS AND COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT, FINISHING SYSTEMS, INC., THAT ALL REFERENCES TO, AND/OR CLAIMS FOR, PUNITIVE DAMAGES, GROSS NEGLIGENCE, RECKLESSNESS, OUTRAGEOUS ACTS, AND SUB-PART (PPP) OF PARAGRAPH 205 WITH RESPECT TO DEFENDANT, FINISHING SYSTEMS, INC., ARE STRICKEN AND DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/21/20. 8/21/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT BY AND BETWEEN COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS AND COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT EDWIN L. HEIM, CO., THAT ALL REFERENCES TO, AND/OR CLAIMS FOR, PUNITIVE DAMAGES, GROSS NEGLIGENCE, RECKLESSNESS, AND OUTRAGEOUS ACTS, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THOSE CONTAINED IN THE NEGLIGENCE CLAIM OF COUNT III, THE CLAIMS OF NEGLIGENT INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS OF COUNTS XXV, XXVI, XXVII, XXVIII, XXIX, XXX, THE WRONGFUL DEATH CLAIMS OF COUNTS XXXI AND XXXII, AND THE SURVIVAL CLAIMS OF COUNTS XXXIII AND XXXIV, AS WELL AS PARAGRAPHS 222, 223, 519, 522-27, 534-39, 543, 547, AND THE AD DAMNUM CLAUSES OF PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT, WITH RESPECT TO DEFENDANT EDWIN L. HEIM CO., ARE STRICKEN AND DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/21/20. 8/21/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7.4, PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT, GLOBAL FINISHING SOLUTIONS, LLC, HEREBY STIPULATE AND AGREE THAT THE TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT GLOBAL FINISHING SOLUTIONS, LLCS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE IS HEREBY EXTENDED THROUGH SEPTEMBER 4, 2020. NO PRIOR EXTENSION HAS BEEN REQUESTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/21/20. 8/21/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7.4, PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT, GRACO INC., HEREBY STIPULATE AND AGREE THAT THE TIME FOR GRACO INC. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT IS HEREBY EXTENDED THROUGH AUGUST 25, 2020. NO PRIOR EXTENSION HAS BEEN REQUESTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/21/20. 8/21/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7.4, PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT, AIRGAS SAFETY, INC. (AIRGAS) HEREBY STIPULATE AND AGREE THAT THE TIME FOR AIRGAS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT IS HEREBY EXTENDED THROUGH AUGUST 18, 2020. NO PRIOR EXTENSION HAS BEEN REQUESTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/21/20. 8/21/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(mas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 100 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CARLISLE FLUID TECHNOLOGIES.Brief and Certificate of Service.(CAMPBELL, GLENN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 99 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims for Punitive Damages without Prejudice by AIRGAS SAFETY, INC.. (FOWLER, JOSEPH) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 98 ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by AIRGAS SAFETY, INC..(FOWLER, JOSEPH) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 97 Response TO GRAPEK COMPANY'S CROSSCLAIM by EDWIN L. HEIM CO.. (POORE, JASON) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN M. MCMANUS on behalf of SCM CONSTRUCTION LLC, SCM CONSTRUCTION LLC with Jury Demand(MCMANUS, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 95 STIPULATION by MI-KEE-TRO METAL MANUFACTURING, INC.. (CAMPBELL, ANDREW) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 94 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by SAMES KREMLIN, INC.. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (BRONSTEIN, DAVID) Modified on 8/21/2020 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 93 STIPULATION between Counsel by BFPE INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (SOTLAND, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 92 RESPONSE in Support re #49 MOTION to Transfer Venue to U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania filed by GRACO INC.. (KUNSCH, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 91 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by GRACO INC..(KUNSCH, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 90 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of George Bogris by BFPE INTERNATIONAL, INC.. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14508053.). (SOTLAND, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 89 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by SAVANNAH D. BYERS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Certificate of Service)(BENDESKY, LARRY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Filing 88 STIPULATION of Dismissal to dismiss all claims for punitive damages, recklessness and gross negligence in plaintiff's amended complaint without prejudice as to Sames Kremlin Inc. only by SAMES KREMLIN, INC.. (BRONSTEIN, DAVID) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER OF 8/18/20 THAT THE APPLICATION OF SHAWN M. RAITER, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/18/20. 8/18/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) (COPY NOT MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES) Modified on 8/18/2020 (dt, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 86 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint in part filed by AIRGAS SAFETY, INC..Brief and Certificate of Service.(FOWLER, JOSEPH) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 85 Response to New Matter Crossclaim of Grapek by BFPE INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (SOTLAND, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 84 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Shawn M. Raiter, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14499302.) filed by GRACO INC...(KUNSCH, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 83 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) filed by BFPE INTERNATIONAL, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SOTLAND, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 82 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by MI-KEE-TRO METAL MANUFACTURING, INC..(CAMPBELL, ANDREW) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 81 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Punitive Damages Against Global Finishing Solutions, LLC without Prejudice by SAVANNAH D. BYERS. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (FELLMETH, SCOTT) Modified on 8/17/2020 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 80 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Punitive Damages Against Finishing Systems, Inc. without Prejudice by SAVANNAH D. BYERS. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL).(FELLMETH, SCOTT) Modified on 8/17/2020 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 79 STIPULATION by EDWIN L. HEIM CO.. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (POORE, JASON) Modified on 8/17/2020 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 78 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Carlisle Companies Incorporated by CARLISLE FLUID TECHNOLOGIES.(ALTSCHULER, DANIEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL SETH ALTSCHULER on behalf of CARLISLE FLUID TECHNOLOGIES with Jury Demand(ALTSCHULER, DANIEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 76 Joinder filed by AMEREX CORPORATION, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(FANTINI, LAUREN) Modified on 8/17/2020 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 75 Joinder filed by AMEREX CORPORATION.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(FANTINI, LAUREN) Modified on 8/17/2020 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 74 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, in Part, filed by SAVANNAH D. BYERS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit Exhibits A-F)(BENDESKY, LARRY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 73 Response re #26 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by MI-KEE-TRO METAL MANUFACTURING, INC.. (CAMPBELL, ANDREW) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 72 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including LAir Liquide S.A. by AIRGAS SAFETY, INC..(FOWLER, JOSEPH) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 71 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by AMEREX CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(FANTINI, LAUREN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 70 Response to Cross Claim re #26 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by GLOBAL FINISHING SOLUTIONS, LLC. (FARRELL, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint In Part filed by MI-KEE-TRO METAL MANUFACTURING, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(CAMPBELL, ANDREW) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 68 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by SAMES KREMLIN, INC..(SHORR, JENNIFER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM MICHAEL BARNES on behalf of JIM DORTON CONTRACTING with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(BARNES, ADAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 66 Joinder of Global Finishng Solutions, LLC's Motion to Transfer (Doc. No. 49) filed by SCHWEITZER & CROSSON, INC..certificate of service.(SPERLING, WARREN) Modified on 8/13/2020 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 65 Joinder of Finishing Systems Inc.'s Motion for Transfer Venue (Doc. No. 18) filed by SCHWEITZER & CROSSON, INC..Certificate of Service.(SPERLING, WARREN) Modified on 8/13/2020 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER GLAZER SHORR on behalf of SAMES KREMLIN, INC. with Jury Demand(SHORR, JENNIFER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID R. BRONSTEIN on behalf of SAMES KREMLIN, INC. with Jury Demand(BRONSTEIN, DAVID) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 62 RESPONSE to Motion re #49 MOTION to Transfer Venue to U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania filed by MI-KEE-TRO METAL MANUFACTURING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(CAMPBELL, ANDREW) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 61 Stipuulation to Extend Plaintiffs Time to Respond to Defendant Global Finishing Solution's Motion to Transfer Venue re #49 MOTION to Transfer Venue to U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania filed by SAVANNAH D. BYERS. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL).(FELLMETH, SCOTT) Modified on 8/12/2020 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN C. FANTINI on behalf of AMEREX CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(FANTINI, LAUREN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 59 STIPULATION re #3 Amended Complaint for Extension of Time to File Answer with Certificate of Service by GRACO INC.. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (KUNSCH, JOHN) Modified on 8/12/2020 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN MICHAEL KUNSCH on behalf of GRACO INC. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(KUNSCH, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by GLOBAL FINISHING SOLUTIONS, LLC.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Affidiavit of Service)(UNDERWOOD, ELIZABETH) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint in Part filed by SCHWEITZER & CROSSON, INC..Brief, Certificate of Service.(SPERLING, WARREN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 54 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Tom Winters re: served Amended Complaint upon Robin Deibis on behalf of Carlisle Fluid Technologies by Personal on 08/05/2020 (PANTANO, ADAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 53 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Dawn Duffy re: served Amended Complaint upon Tanya Reeves on behalf of Amerex Fire International by Personal on 08/03/2020 (PANTANO, ADAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 52 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Bob Rahn re: served Amended Complaint upon Jenna Floyd on behalf of Graco Inc. by Personal on 07/21/2020 (PANTANO, ADAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 55 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (nd, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SAVANNAH D. BYERS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit Exhibits A-E, #4 Certificate of Service)(BENDESKY, LARRY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SAVANNAH D. BYERS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Certificate of Service)(BENDESKY, LARRY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION to Transfer Venue to U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania filed by GLOBAL FINISHING SOLUTIONS, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit 1 - Preaecipe to Issue Writ of Summons, #3 Exhibit 2 - Praecipe to Discontinue, #4 Exhibit 3 - Phila. Civil Docket, #5 Exhibit 4 - Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit 5 - Deft., Grapek Ans. to Plaintiff's First Ameneded Complaint)(UNDERWOOD, ELIZABETH) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW P. CAMPBELL on behalf of MI-KEE-TRO METAL MANUFACTURING, INC. with Certificate of Service(CAMPBELL, ANDREW) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT ALBERT DISANDRO on behalf of MI-KEE-TRO METAL MANUFACTURING, INC. with Certificate of Service(DISANDRO, ROBERT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 46 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by BFPE INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SOTLAND, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN J. DELANY, III on behalf of MI-KEE-TRO METAL MANUFACTURING, INC. with Jury demand and Certificate of Service(DELANY, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER OF 8/4/20 THAT A TELEPHONIC ORAL ARGUMENT ON ALL OUTSTANDING MOTIONS SHALL BE HELD ON AUGUST 24, 2020 AT 11:00AM. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/4/20. 08/4/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER J. RUBINATE on behalf of SCHWEITZER & CROSSON, INC. (RUBINATE, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 42 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Amended Complaint filed by AIRGAS SAFETY, INC..Certificate of Service. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (FOWLER, JOSEPH) Modified on 8/6/2020 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by WARREN F. SPERLING on behalf of SCHWEITZER & CROSSON, INC. (SPERLING, WARREN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT of Service by John Baratta re: served Amended Complaint upon Steven Metzer on behalf of SCM Construction LLC by Personal on 07/29/2020 (PANTANO, ADAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TIM ADAMS. (FELLMETH, SCOTT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT BFPE INTERNATIONAL, INC., SHALL HAVE UNTIL SEPTEMBER 18, 2020 TO FILE AN ANSWER IN THE ABOVE MATTER. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/3/20. 8/3/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(DT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE IS HEREBY ETENDED THROUGH AUGUST 21, 2020. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/3/20. 8/3/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dt, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW VODZAK on behalf of AIRGAS SAFETY, INC. (VODZAK, MATTHEW) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by DAMIAN M. TARANTO on behalf of AIRGAS SAFETY, INC. (TARANTO, DAMIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 34 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by AIRGAS SAFETY, INC.. (FOWLER, JOSEPH) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH R. FOWLER on behalf of AIRGAS SAFETY, INC. (FOWLER, JOSEPH) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH A. GORMAN on behalf of AMEREX CORPORATION with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Cert of Service)(GORMAN, JOSEPH) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by BRETT A. WOLFSON on behalf of AMEREX CORPORATION with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Cert of Service)(WOLFSON, BRETT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, in Part, filed by EDWIN L. HEIM CO..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(POORE, JASON) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON W. POORE on behalf of EDWIN L. HEIM CO. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Serivce for Entry of Appearance of Michelle D. Reinhart, Esquire. (FILED IN ERROR; ATTORNEY ENTERING APPEARANCE MUST FILE ON OWN BEHALF). (POORE, JASON) Modified on 8/3/2020 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 28 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Re: accepted summons and complaint for BFPE INTERNATIONAL, INC. on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/20/2020. (SOTLAND, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 27 STIPULATION Between Counsel by BFPE INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (SOTLAND, JEFFREY) Modified on 8/3/2020 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiffs, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GRAPEK COMPANY.(KEMETHER, SEAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY C. SOTLAND on behalf of BFPE INTERNATIONAL, INC. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SOTLAND, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by SEAN V. KEMETHER on behalf of GRAPEK COMPANY (KEMETHER, SEAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Wayne Turnquist re: served Amended Complaint upon Maria Kulig on behalf of Global Finishing Solutions LLC by Personal on 07/22/2020 (PANTANO, ADAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Gina Sharbonski re: served Amended Complaint upon Ragan Murray on Behalf of Sames Kremlin Inc. by Personal on 07/27/2020 (PANTANO, ADAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 21 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by TIM ADAMS, DYLAN ALDRIDGE, CODY ASH, CYNTHIA L. BARNES, WALTER P. BURYK, III, SAVANNAH D. BYERS, CODY KING, MIKE ROWLES, SAMUEL L. SMITH. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL).(FELLMETH, SCOTT) Modified on 7/31/2020 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by FIRESTOP SOLUTIONS, INC..Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit)(KROLL, ROLF) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by FINISHING SYSTEMS, INC..Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief)(MCCARROLL, SCOTT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by FINISHING SYSTEMS, INC..Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Exhibit)(MCCARROLL, SCOTT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by EDWIN L. HEIM CO..(POORE, JASON) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Anthony Devers re: served Amended Complaint upon Kyle Martin on behalf of Grapek Company by Personal on 07/20/2020 (PANTANO, ADAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Anthony Devers re: served Amended Complaint upon Malinda Franks on behalf of Schaedler Yesco Distribution Inc. by Personal on 07/20/2020 (PANTANO, ADAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Anthony Devers re: served Amended Complaint upon Troy Rentzel on behalf of Mi-Kee Tro Metal Manufacturing by Personal on 07/20/2020 (PANTANO, ADAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 18, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Anthony Devers re: served Amended Complaint upon Kevin Hylinski, V.P. Schweitzer & Crosson Inc. by Personal on 07/16/2020 (PANTANO, ADAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service by John Baratta re: served Amended Complaint upon Jim Rickey, Manager of Airgas Safety Inc. by Personal on 07/15/2020 (PANTANO, ADAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH A. UNDERWOOD on behalf of GLOBAL FINISHING SOLUTIONS, LLC (UNDERWOOD, ELIZABETH) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN C. FARRELL on behalf of GLOBAL FINISHING SOLUTIONS, LLC (FARRELL, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE D. COBURN on behalf of EDWIN L. HEIM CO. with Certificate of Service(COBURN, MICHELLE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON W. POORE on behalf of EDWIN L. HEIM CO. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(POORE, JASON) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 Praecipe/Request to Issue Summons by TIM ADAMS, DYLAN ALDRIDGE, CODY ASH, CYNTHIA L. BARNES, WALTER P. BURYK, III, SAVANNAH D. BYERS, CODY KING, MIKE ROWLES, SAMUEL L. SMITH. (PANTANO, ADAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ROLF E. KROLL on behalf of FIRESTOP SOLUTIONS, INC. with JURY DEMAND(KROLL, ROLF) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. FELLMETH on behalf of TIM ADAMS, DYLAN ALDRIDGE, CODY ASH, CYNTHIA L. BARNES, WALTER P. BURYK, III, SAVANNAH D. BYERS (FELLMETH, SCOTT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM J. PANTANO on behalf of TIM ADAMS, DYLAN ALDRIDGE, CODY ASH, CYNTHIA L. BARNES, WALTER P. BURYK, III, SAVANNAH D. BYERS (PANTANO, ADAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Summons Issued as to AIRGAS SAFETY, INC., AMEREX CORPORATION, AMEREX FIRE INTERNATIONAL, INC., BFPE INTERNATIONAL, INC., CARLISLE FLUID TECHNOLOGIES, EDWIN L. HEIM CO., FINISHING SYSTEMS, INC., FIRESTOP SOLUTIONS, INC., GLOBAL FINISHING SOLUTIONS, LLC, GRACO INC., GRAPEK COMPANY, JIM DORTON CONTRACTING, MI-KEE-TRO METAL MANUFACTURING, INC., SAMES KREMLIN, INC., SCHAEDLER/YESCO DISTRIBUTION, INC., SCHWEITZER & CROSSON, INC., SCM CONSTRUCTION LLC. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 7/13/20 (JL ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by CODY ASH, WALTER P. BURYK, III, CYNTHIA L. BARNES, TIM ADAMS, SAVANNAH D. BYERS, DYLAN ALDRIDGE.(BENDESKY, LARRY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
June 30, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by TIM ADAMS, DYLAN ALDRIDGE, CODY ASH, CYNTHIA L. BARNES, WALTER P. BURYK, III, SAVANNAH D. BYERS, FINISHING SYSTEMS, INC., CODY KING, MIKE ROWLES, SAMUEL L. SMITH. (fb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by FINISHING SYSTEMS, INC..(MCCARROLL, SCOTT) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FINISHING SYSTEMS, INC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14390500), filed by FINISHING SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Exhibit State Court Docket, #5 Exhibit Writ, #6 Exhibit Sheriff's Return, #7 Exhibit Entry of Appearance, #8 Exhibit Order, #9 Exhibit Complaint, #10 Exhibit Affidavit, #11 Exhibit Consent Forms)(MCCARROLL, SCOTT) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/1/2020) (fb, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 11/13/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BYERS et al v. FINISHING SYSTEMS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlisle Fluid Technologies
Represented By: Daniel Seth Altschuler
Represented By: Glenn M. Campbell
Represented By: Daniel S Altschuler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Dorton Contracting
Represented By: Adam Michael Barnes
Represented By: Amanda Steffy
Represented By: Gretchen Fitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graco Inc.
Represented By: Shawn M. Raiter
Represented By: John Michael Kunsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airgas Safety, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Vodzak
Represented By: Joseph R. Fowler
Represented By: Damian M. Taranto
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Vodzak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abc Corporations (A-Z)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Finishing Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Scott D. McCarroll
Represented By: Julia A Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abc Corporation A-F
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sames Kremlin, Inc.
Represented By: David R. Bronstein
Represented By: Jennifer Glazer Shorr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schweitzer & Crosson, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Rubinate
Represented By: Warren F. Sperling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Finishing Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Underwood
Represented By: John C. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mi-Kee-Tro Metal Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Albert Disandro
Represented By: John J. Delany, III
Represented By: Andrew P. Campbell
Represented By: Robert A. DiSandro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grapek Company
Represented By: Sean V. Kemether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin L. Heim Co.
Represented By: Michelle D. Coburn
Represented By: Jason W. Poore
Represented By: Michelle L. Reinhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firestop Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Rolf E. Kroll
Represented By: Anthony J. Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bfpe International, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Sotland
Represented By: George Dean Bogris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schaedler/Yesco Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick J. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCM Construction LLC
Represented By: Stephen M. McManus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerex Fire International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerex Corporation
Represented By: Lauren C. Fantini
Represented By: Joseph A. Gorman
Represented By: Brett A. Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody King
Represented By: Scott A. Fellmeth
Represented By: Larry Bendesky
Represented By: Adam J. Pantano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel L. Smith
Represented By: Scott A. Fellmeth
Represented By: Larry Bendesky
Represented By: Adam J. Pantano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savannah D. Byers
Represented By: Scott A. Fellmeth
Represented By: Larry Bendesky
Represented By: Adam J. Pantano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Rowles
Represented By: Scott A. Fellmeth
Represented By: Larry Bendesky
Represented By: Adam J. Pantano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia L. Barnes
Represented By: Scott A. Fellmeth
Represented By: Larry Bendesky
Represented By: Adam J. Pantano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Ash
Represented By: Scott A. Fellmeth
Represented By: Larry Bendesky
Represented By: Adam J. Pantano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Aldridge
Represented By: Scott A. Fellmeth
Represented By: Larry Bendesky
Represented By: Adam J. Pantano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Adams
Represented By: Scott A. Fellmeth
Represented By: Larry Bendesky
Represented By: Adam J. Pantano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter P. Buryk, III
Represented By: Scott A. Fellmeth
Represented By: Larry Bendesky
Represented By: Adam J. Pantano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?