Tirado v. HCR Manorcare et al
Plaintiff: Angela R. Tirado
Defendant: Shaquira Howell and HCR Manorcare doing business as Manorcare of York PA South, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02219
Filed: November 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 - AND NOW, this 22nd date of January, 2021, upon consideration of the parties Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration (Doc. 7), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and this matter is STAYED pending the completion of arbitration proceedings. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 1/22/21. (dmn)
January 21, 2021 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration by HCR Manorcare, Shaquira Howell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leahy, William)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 - Defendants shall file their Response to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before January 27, 2021. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 12/18/20 (dmn)
December 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by HCR Manorcare, Shaquira Howell.(Leahy, William)
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela R. Tirado. HCR Manorcare served on 12/7/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; Shaquira Howell served on 12/7/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Affidavit of Service, #2 Summons Affidavit of Service)(Donham, Jeremy)
December 2, 2020 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 12/2/20. (dmn)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to HCR Manorcare, Shaquira Howell and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr)
November 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HCR Manorcare, Shaquira Howell ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number APAMDC-5364129), filed by Angela R. Tirado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tirado v. HCR Manorcare et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaquira Howell
Represented By: William J. Leahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCR Manorcare doing business as Manorcare of York PA South, LLC
Represented By: William J. Leahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela R. Tirado
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Donham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?