Perez-Rivera v. Harper et al
Plaintiff: Bryan A. Perez-Rivera
Defendant: W. Dreibelbis, John Doe (2), John Doe (1), C.O. Audrey, PAC Pierce, SCI-Smithfield, Dr. Doll, Lt. Keel, R.N. Hartman, John Doe (3), LT. Harper, C.O. Dively, R.N. Lidwell and Wexford Health Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02257
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MA
Referring Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 9 Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to C.O. Audrey, C.O. Dively, Dr. Doll, W. Dreibelbis, LT. Harper, R.N. Hartman, Lt. Keel, R.N. Lidwell, PAC Pierce, SCI-Smithfield, Wexford Health Services, Inc. Waiver of Service due by 2/16/2021. (ma)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants. Granting the Motions for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #2 and #6 . The Superintendent/Warden, or other appropriate official at Plaintiffs place of confinement, is directed to deduct an initial partial filing fee of 20% of the greater of...see order for details. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send a copy of this order to the Superintendent/Warden of the institution where Plaintiff is presently confined. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 1/14/21. (ma)
January 4, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFIED Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Bryan A. Perez-Rivera. (dw)
January 4, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFIED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bryan A. Perez-Rivera.(dw)
December 3, 2020 Filing 5 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 12/03/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp)
December 3, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Instruction Sheet, #3 Federal & Local Rules, #4 398 Form) (lp)
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFIED Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Bryan A. Perez-Rivera. (lp)
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis including certification, by Bryan A. Perez-Rivera.(lp) Modified on 12/3/2020 (lp). lacks authorization
December 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Bryan A. Perez-Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Supplemental Table of Contents to the Complaint & Exhibits)(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez-Rivera v. Harper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Dreibelbis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Audrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAC Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI-Smithfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Doll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Keel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.N. Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Dively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.N. Lidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan A. Perez-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?