Manuel v. Harry et al
Plaintiff: Karl B Manuel
Defendant: Beth Herb, John Horner, Greg Forsyth, Laurel Harry and Justin Rutherford
Case Number: 1:2020cv02309
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MA
Referring Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 7 Mail (Doc. 6) sent to Karl Manuel returned as 'RELEASED'. (pjr)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that within twenty (20) days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file with the court his current address. Failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 1/14/2021. (mw)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Doc. #4 "Released" Mail sent to Karl B. Manuel (ga)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Instruction Sheet, #3 Federal & Local Rules, #4 398 Form) (lp)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFIED Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Karl B Manuel. (lp)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (uncertified) filed by Karl B Manuel.(lp)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the application to proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Karl B Manuel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manuel v. Harry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Herb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Horner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurel Harry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl B Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?