Lee-Chima v. Hughes et al
Plaintiff: Kasheyon Lee-Chima
Defendant: C.O. McHugh, SCI-Waymart, K. Hughes, C.J. McKeown and C.O. Van Burren
Case Number: 1:2020cv02349
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EBC
Referring Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFIED Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Kasheyon Lee-Chima. (ao)
February 8, 2021 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kasheyon Lee-Chima.(ao) Modified on 2/10/2021 (ao).
February 8, 2021 Filing 15 Certification of prisoner's account balance filed by Kasheyon Lee-Chima. (ao)
February 3, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kasheyon Lee-Chima (ga)
January 25, 2021 Filing 13 Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to K. Hughes, C.O. McHugh, C.J. McKeown, & C.O. Van Burren. Waiver of Service due by 2/24/2021. (rw)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants. See order for details. (eo)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the motions (Docs. 7, 9) are DENIED.If further proceedings demonstrate the need for counsel, the matter will bereconsidered either sua sponte or upon motion of Plaintiff. (eo)
January 21, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFIED MOTION (Application) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kasheyon Lee-Chima.(ao)
January 14, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kasheyon Lee-Chima.(ao)
January 4, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFIED Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Supt. Assistant. (ga) Modified on 1/4/2021 (lp).
December 22, 2020 Filing 7 (LETTER) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kasheyon Lee-Chima with inquiries as to case. Copy of docket sent explaining that this one copy is free this time, but that regardless of in forma pauperis status, in the future his request would need to include payment of 10 cents per page and include a self-addressed stamped envelope.(ep)
December 16, 2020 Filing 6 FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the superintendent or warden of the institution at which Plaintiff is currently incarcerated is directed to provide certified copies of the statement of Plaintiff's trust fund account to this Court and to the Plaintiff. The statement should reflect all activity in that account for the six-month period immediately preceding the lodging of the complaint in this action.Order sent to Superintendent and plaintiff. Signed by LP on 12/16/2020. (lp)
December 16, 2020 Filing 5 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Instruction Sheet, #3 Federal & Local Rules) (lp)
December 16, 2020 Filing 4 AO 398 and AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (lp)
December 16, 2020 Filing 3 UNCERTIFIED Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Kasheyon Lee-Chima. (lp)
December 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis including certification filed by Kasheyon Lee-Chima.(lp)
December 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Kasheyon Lee-Chima. (Attachments: #1 cover letter)(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee-Chima v. Hughes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI-Waymart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.J. McKeown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Van Burren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kasheyon Lee-Chima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?