Irwin v. Fry Communications, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kathryn Irwin
Defendant: Fry Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00186
Filed: February 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Jennifer P Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Filing 13 CIVIL PRACTICE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 3/31/2021. (ve)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT: This case has been selected at random for mandatory referral to court annexed mediation in accordance with Standing Order 04-3. The initial case management conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 will be conducted via telephone by the court on June 4, 2021, at 11:30 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the telephone conference and have all parties on the line prior to calling chambers at (717) 221-3970. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 3/31/2021. (ve)
March 25, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Fry Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix of Unreported Cases to Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 to Appendix of Unreported Cases to Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2 to Appendix of Unreported Cases to Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, #4 Certificate of Service)(Manohar, Aarthi)
March 22, 2021 Filing 10 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Kathryn Irwin. (Attachments: #1 Memo Memo of Law in Opposition, #2 Appendix Unpublished Decisions, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - Complaint)(Doyle, Brian)
March 9, 2021 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Fry Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Unreported Cases and Exhibits to Memorandum of Law of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A to Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B to Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C to Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #5 Certification of Word Count to Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #6 Certificate of Service to Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint)(Manohar, Aarthi)
March 9, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Fry Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Manohar, Aarthi)
February 18, 2021 Filing 7 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson. (ve)
February 18, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fry Communications, Inc.. (Manohar, Aarthi)
February 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig W. Hillwig on behalf of Fry Communications, Inc.. (Hillwig, Craig)
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Aarthi Manohar on behalf of Fry Communications, Inc. (Manohar, Aarthi)
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Kathryn Irwin. Fry Communications, Inc. waiver sent on 2/5/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. (Doyle, Brian)
February 3, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Fry Communications, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr)
February 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fry Communications, Inc. ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5457242), filed by Kathryn Irwin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr)
February 3, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been re-assigned to Judge Wilson. (pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irwin v. Fry Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fry Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Aarthi Manohar
Represented By: Craig W. Hillwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Irwin
Represented By: Brian M Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?