RVM v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: RVM
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, Michael Paul, Connie Nolan, William Connor, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Tracey Renaud and Alejandro Mayorkas
Case Number: 1:2021cv00300
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Referring Judge: Jennifer P Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Action
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER - In order to ensure that the instant case is managed in a prompt and efficient manner, IT IS ORDERED THAT counsel are directed to confer and file a joint letter by no later than 12:00 p.m. on April 23, 2021, indicating whether the arguments for dismissal that have been briefed in Jane Doe #1 v. Wolf, et al. will need to be addressed in this case.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a telephone status conference is scheduled for April 27, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call when all parties are on the line to chambers at (717) 221-3970. The case management conference scheduled for April 19, 2021 is CANCELLED pending further order of the court. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 4/13/2021. (ve)
April 8, 2021 VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson for all further proceedings. Honorable Christopher C. Conner no longer assigned to case. (jw)
March 26, 2021 Filing 9 VERBAL ORDER - The Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2021 has been CONTINUED TO 4/19/2021 at 10:30 AM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 3/26/2021. (mw)
March 24, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to William Connor, Alejandro Mayorkas, Connie Nolan, Michael Paul, Tracey Renaud, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security and provided TO U.S. MARSHAL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (mw)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that RVMs motion (Doc. 2) for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is CONDITIONALLY GRANTED, pending resolution of this action and any disputes over counsels costs and fees. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue process to the United States Marshal, who is directed to serve plaintiffs complaint in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4 within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 3/9/2021. (mw)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2021 at 10:30 AM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 2/26/2021. (mw)
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanne M. Sanderson on behalf of William Connor, Alejandro Mayorkas, Connie Nolan, Michael Paul, Tracey Renaud, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Sanderson, Joanne)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 2/19/2021. (mw)
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Mahon on behalf of RVM. (rw)
February 18, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by RVM.(rw)
February 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by RVM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover letter)(rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RVM v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Paul
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Nolan
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Connor
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey Renaud
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RVM
Represented By: Andrew J. Mahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?