DARRUP v. WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP et al
Plaintiff: Julie Darrup
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East L.P., Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc. and Walmart Supercenter #2481
Case Number: 1:2021cv00314
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Harrisburg Office
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Filing 16 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-05450 containing electronic documents.
February 18, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' PETITION TO TRANSFER TO THE U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA #10 IS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 28 USC SEC. 1404. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TRANSFER THIS ACTION TO THE U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA AND MARK THIS CASE CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 2/18/21. 2/18/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/19/2021.]
February 18, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 2/18/21. 2/18/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/19/2021.]
February 4, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 First MOTION to Transfer filed by JULIE DARRUP. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Opposition of Defendants Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(KAPLUN, THEODOR) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/19/2021.]
January 26, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT REFERRAL TO COUNSEL - MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY. 01/26/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED. (miah,) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/19/2021.]
January 22, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP, WALMART SUPERCENTER #2481. (CHEW, RAMSEY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/19/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Filing 10 PETITION to Transfer filed by WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP, WALMART SUPERCENTER #2481.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(CHEW, RAMSEY) Modified on 2/2/2021 (lvj, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/19/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER ON OR BEFORE 01/22/2021 AND SHALL FILE ANY MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE ON OR BEFORE 01/29/2021 OR HAVE THE ISSUE DEEMED WAIVED; ALL MOTIONS TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT AND TO JOIN OR ADD ADDITIONAL PARTIES SHALL BE FILED BY 1/29/2021; THE PARTIES SHALL COMPLETE ALL DISCOVERY BY 5/21/2021; MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED BY 6/11/2021. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEDLINES AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY FOR PURPOSES OF CONDUCTING SETTLEMENT PROCEEDINGS, AS JUDGE HEY DEEMS APPROPRIATE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 01/20/2021. 01/20/2021 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/19/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON. Re: A Pretrial/Rule 16 Conference was held on 1/19/21. (fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/19/2021.]
January 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN D. MARX on behalf of JULIE DARRUP with Certificate of Service(MARX, JONATHAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/19/2021.]
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 1/19/2021 AT 3:00 PM WITH LEAD COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES BEFORE HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 12/22/2020. 12/22/2020 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/19/2021.]
December 18, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP, WALMART SUPERCENTER #2481.(CHEW, RAMSEY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/19/2021.]
November 13, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Counsel damages recoverable in excess of $150,000.00 by THEODOR KAPLUN on behalf of JULIE DARRUP(KAPLUN, THEODOR) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/19/2021.]
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. MCDONNELL on behalf of WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP, WALMART SUPERCENTER #2481 with Certificate of Service(MCDONNELL, PATRICK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/19/2021.]
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Walmart Inc. by WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP.(CHEW, RAMSEY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/19/2021.]
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALMART SUPERCENTER #2481, WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14681685), filed by WALMART SUPERCENTER #2481, WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Designation Form, #6 Case Management Track Form)(CHEW, RAMSEY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/19/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DARRUP v. WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Represented By: Patrick J. McDonnell
Represented By: Ramsey H. Chew, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick J. McDonnell
Represented By: Ramsey H. Chew, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Supercenter #2481
Represented By: Patrick J. McDonnell
Represented By: Ramsey H. Chew, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Darrup
Represented By: Jonathan D. Marx
Represented By: Theodor Kaplun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?