Red Lion Area School District v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Red Lion Area School District
Defendant: James Monsees, Adam Bowen, John Does 1-100, Altria Group, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Riaz Valani, JUUL Labs, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, NU Mark LLC, Philip Morris USA, Inc. and Hoyoung Huh
Case Number: 1:2021cv00428
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Referring Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case transferred from Pennsylvania Middle has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:21-cv-02120, filed 03/26/2021. (jw)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA (MDL No. 2913) PER CERTIFIED CTO-59. (mw)
March 24, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case electronically transferred to Northern District of California on 3/24/21. (mw)
March 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Sweeney on behalf of Red Lion Area School District (Sweeney, Michael)
March 10, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Red Lion Area School District (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Shuber, Jordan)
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael I. Levin on behalf of Red Lion Area School District (Levin, Michael)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael I. Levin on behalf of Red Lion Area School District (Levin, Michael)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan P. Shuber on behalf of Red Lion Area School District (Shuber, Jordan)
March 10, 2021 Senior Judge Judge Rambo has transferred this case and directed that this matter be reassigned. (sm)
March 10, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel, Michael Sweeney, is advised to update address information thru Pacer. Go to: www.pacer.gov then select Manage My Account. (pjr)
March 10, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Chief Judge Jones (sm)
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5506644), filed by Red Lion Area School District. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Red Lion Area School District v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Monsees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Client Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Distribution Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riaz Valani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUUL Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NU Mark LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Morris USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoyoung Huh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Lion Area School District
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Represented By: Michael T. Sweeney
Represented By: Michael I. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?