Podobayev et al v. ALLIANCE LAUNDRY SYSTEMS LLC et al
Plaintiff: Galina Ilin and Vladimir Podobayev
Defendant: Alliance Laundry Systems LLC, John Does 1-5 and Speed Queen Laundry LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00445
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Filing 17 CIVIL PRACTICE ORDER - SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 5/10/2021. (mw)
May 10, 2021 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Fact Discovery due by 10/6/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 1/5/2022. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 5/10/2021. (mw)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(D). Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 4/22/2021. (mw)
April 22, 2021 Filing 13 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 4/22/2021. (mw)
April 14, 2021 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Protective Order, #2 Exhibit(s) Proposed Clawback Order)(Rash, Anthony)
April 7, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Document 12 deleted due to clerical error. (aaa)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2021 at 02:00 PM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 3/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Term. Calendar)(mw)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 3/12/2021. (mw)
March 12, 2021 Filing 9 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-00832 containing electronic documents.
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/11/21. 3/11/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/12/2021.]
March 11, 2021 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/11/21 (kf, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/12/2021.]
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT JOINT - PER RULE 26(f) by ALLIANCE LAUNDRY SYSTEMS LLC, Speed Queen Laundry LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(RASH, ANTHONY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/12/2021.]
March 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN MICHAEL FERRIS on behalf of Galina Ilin, Vladimir Podobayev (FERRIS, BRYAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/12/2021.]
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 3/11/2021 AT 11:00 AM, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/1/21. 3/2/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) Modified on 3/4/2021 (va, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/12/2021.]
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including ALH Holding, Inc. with Certificate of Service by ALLIANCE LAUNDRY SYSTEMS LLC, Speed Queen Laundry LLC.(RASH, ANTHONY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/12/2021.]
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative DeFenses by ALLIANCE LAUNDRY SYSTEMS LLC, Speed Queen Laundry LLC.(RASH, ANTHONY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/12/2021.]
February 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Speed Queen Laundry LLC, ALLIANCE LAUNDRY SYSTEMS LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14937670), filed by Speed Queen Laundry LLC, ALLIANCE LAUNDRY SYSTEMS LLC.(RASH, ANTHONY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/12/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Podobayev et al v. ALLIANCE LAUNDRY SYSTEMS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galina Ilin
Represented By: Bryan M. Ferris
Represented By: Brandon A. Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vladimir Podobayev
Represented By: Bryan M. Ferris
Represented By: Brandon A. Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Laundry Systems LLC
Represented By: Anthony J. Rash
Represented By: Anthony John Rash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speed Queen Laundry LLC
Represented By: Anthony J. Rash
Represented By: Anthony John Rash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?