Johnson v. Pennsylvania Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Aquil Johnson
Defendant: Dr. Fernando Tejeda, John Wetzel, Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Michelle Fisher, Dr. Richard Ellers, Mark Garman and Pennsylvania Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2021cv00516
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: PT
Referring Judge: Jennifer P Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #21 MOTION to Dismiss ECF No. 1-2. Brief in Opposition due by 6/18/2021. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 5/20/2021 (ve)
May 17, 2021 Filing 27 Letter cc'd to Court from Aquil Johnson re case. (aaa)
May 17, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Aquil Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(aaa)
May 12, 2021 Filing 25 REPLY BRIEF re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dr. Richard Ellers, Mark Garman(Superintendent of SCI-Rockview), Pennsylvania Department of Corrections, Dr. Fernando Tejeda, John Wetzel.(Gallagher, Daniel)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Stay Discovery of Defendants Wellpath, LLC. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 5/10/2021 (ve)
May 7, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Michelle Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Seabrooks, Keanna)
May 5, 2021 Filing 22 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #21 MOTION to Dismiss ECF No. 1-2 filed by Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Michelle Fisher.(Seabrooks, Keanna)
May 4, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss ECF No. 1-2 by Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Michelle Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Memo, #2 Proposed Order)(Seabrooks, Keanna)
April 28, 2021 Filing 20 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Aquil Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s))(aaa)
April 28, 2021 Filing 19 REQUEST for Withdraw Motion for Extension of time by Aquil Johnson. (aaa)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 4/26/2021 (ve)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - AND NOW, on this 26th day of April, 2021, upon consideration of Plaintiffs motions for extension of time to oppose Defendants motion to dismiss, see Docs. 14, 15, IT IS ORDERED THAT the motions are GRANTED. Plaintiff may file his opposition brief by Friday, May 21, 2021. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 4/26/2021 (ve)
April 23, 2021 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's ComplaintECF No. 1 by Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Michelle Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Seabrooks, Keanna)
April 21, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief in Opposition by Aquil Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(aaa)
April 21, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Aquil Johnson.(ga)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #10 Motion to Appoint Counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED : Plaintiff filed his opposition to DOC Defendants motion to dismiss prior to his receipt of their supporting brief, the court strikes from the docket his premature filing, Doc. 11, and grants him twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order to file an opposition brief. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 4/19/2021 (ve)
April 13, 2021 Filing 12 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dr. Richard Ellers, Mark Garman(Superintendent of SCI-Rockview), Pennsylvania Department of Corrections, Dr. Fernando Tejeda, John Wetzel.(Gallagher, Daniel)
April 9, 2021 Filing 11 **STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD PURSUANT TO ORDER #13 ** BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Aquil Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(aaa) Modified on 4/19/2021 (ve).
April 9, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Aquil Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(aaa)
April 2, 2021 Filing 9 AO 398 and AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (dw)
April 2, 2021 Filing 8 Letter from Aquil Johnson re: filing fees. (dw)
March 30, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Dr. Richard Ellers, Mark Garman(Superintendent of SCI-Rockview), Pennsylvania Department of Corrections, Dr. Fernando Tejeda, John Wetzel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gallagher, Daniel)
March 30, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc 7 deleted per PA Atty Gen; Document to be refiled correctly. (sm)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 3/29/2021 (ve)
March 26, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Correct Care Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent None for Correct Care Solutions, LLC. (Seabrooks, Keanna)
March 26, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Michelle Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Seabrooks, Keanna)
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Keanna Adinae Seabrooks on behalf of Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Michelle Fisher (Seabrooks, Keanna)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Instruction Sheet, #3 Fed and Local Rules, #4 398 Forms, #5 399 form) (lp)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Michelle Fisher from Centre County Courthouse, case number 2021-00365. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAMDC-5519133), filed by Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Michelle Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibits, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Centre County Court, #5 Notice of Removal to United States District Court)(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Pennsylvania Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Fernando Tejeda
Represented By: Daniel J. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wetzel
Represented By: Daniel J. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Samuel H. Foreman
Represented By: Keanna Seabrooks
Represented By: Keanna Adinae Seabrooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Fisher
Represented By: Samuel H. Foreman
Represented By: Keanna Seabrooks
Represented By: Keanna Adinae Seabrooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Richard Ellers
Represented By: Daniel J. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Garman
Represented By: Daniel J. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania Department of Corrections
Represented By: Daniel J. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aquil Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?