Katavitch v. Ulta Beauty Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Katavitch
Defendant: Ulta Beauty Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00540
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that The above-captioned action is STAYED. The parties shall file a joint status report no later than June 15, 2021. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 3/30/2021. (mw)
March 29, 2021 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay by Ulta Beauty Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sher, Brandon)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2021 at 02:15 PM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 3/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Term. Calendar)(mw)
March 26, 2021 Filing 5 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Jacqueline R. Barrett. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 3/26/2021. (mw)
March 26, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Bar status for petitioner and associate counsel verified. (rw)
March 25, 2021 Filing 4 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Brandon R. Sher on behalf of Ulta Beauty Inc. Attorney Jacqueline R. Barrett is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5524488.. (Sher, Brandon)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 3/25/2021. (mw)
March 24, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Ulta Beauty Inc.. (Sher, Brandon)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ulta Beauty Inc. from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-344. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAMDC-5522691), filed by Ulta Beauty Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Katavitch v. Ulta Beauty Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Katavitch
Represented By: Matthew D. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ulta Beauty Inc.
Represented By: Brandon R. Sher
Represented By: Jacqueline R Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?