Doe et al v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe and John Doe
Defendant: Laura Zuchowski, Mark Hazuda, Connie Nolan, Tracy Renaud and Alejandro Mayorkas
Case Number: 1:2021cv00560
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Referring Judge: Jennifer P Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). After you make service, you are further directed to file a Return of Service using the event Summons Returned Executed as to USA under the category Service of Process, in ECF. (ve)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED AS FOLLOWS:In light of the jurisdictional issue raised by the United States in a motion to dismiss in an earlier-filed case, Jane Doe #1 v. Wolf et al. Docket No. 1:20-CV-02239 (M.D. Pa.), which jurisdictional issue is also raised in this case, the briefing deadlines on the anticipated motion to dismiss in this case are hereby STAYED pending the decision on the motion to dismiss in the earlier-filed case. See order for further details. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 4/27/2021. (ve)
April 22, 2021 Filing 8 Letter from Counsel for Plaintiffs and Counsel for Defendants per Order of 4/13/2021. (Simpson, Kathryn)
April 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanne M. Sanderson on behalf of All Defendants. (Sanderson, Joanne)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER - In order to ensure that the instant case is managed in a prompt and efficient manner, IT IS ORDERED THAT counsel are directed to confer and file a joint letter by no later than 12:00 p.m. on April 23, 2021, indicating whether the arguments for dismissal that have been briefed in Jane Doe #1 v. Wolf, et al. will need to be addressed in this case.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a telephone status conference is scheduled for April 27, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call when all parties are on the line to chambers at (717) 221-3970. The case management conference scheduled for May 27, 2021 is CANCELLED pending further order of the court. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 4/13/2021. (ve)
April 8, 2021 VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson for all further proceedings. Chief Judge John E. Jones, III no longer assigned to case. (jw)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis the Plaintiffs shall not be required to pay the civil filing fee in this action (eo)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 5/27/2021 11:00 AM before Chief Judge John E. Jones III. See attached calendar for dates that must be utilized in the JCMP when a trial month is selected. (eo)
March 26, 2021 Senior Judge Yvette Kane has recused and has directed that this matter be reassigned. (dw)
March 26, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Chief Judge John E. Jones, III. (dw)
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 U.S. MARSHAL 285 FORM filed by Plaintiff. (rw)
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Jane Doe, John Doe.(rw)
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Jane Doe, John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Kathryn L Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Kathryn L Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Zuchowski
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hazuda
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Nolan
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Renaud
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?