Roman et al v. Prince Telecom, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Manuel Roman, Anthony Hayward and Jiquelle Kinnard
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC, Comcast Corporation and Prince Telecom, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00693
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Referring Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Filing 33 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Party MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Anthony Hayward, Jiquelle Kinnard, Manuel Roman. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Thornton, Daniel)
June 4, 2021 Filing 32 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Party MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Anthony Hayward, Jiquelle Kinnard, Manuel Roman. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s), #2 Exhibit(s) Table of Contents of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit(s) A, #4 Exhibit(s) B, #5 Exhibit(s) C, #6 Exhibit(s) D, #7 Exhibit(s) E, #8 Exhibit(s) F, #9 Exhibit(s) G, #10 Exhibit(s) H, #11 Exhibit(s) I)(Thornton, Daniel)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Case Management Conference is set for 7/15/2021 at 10:15 AM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 6/1/2021. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS.(sc)
May 27, 2021 Filing 30 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Party MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC, Comcast Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Unpublished Decisions)(Puma, Michael)
May 27, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss Party , MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC, Comcast Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Puma, Michael)
May 21, 2021 Filing 28 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Party MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Prince Telecom, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration A Declaration of Anitha Verghese, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Pritchard, Robert)
May 21, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss Party , MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Prince Telecom, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pritchard, Robert)
May 12, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE by Anthony Hayward, Jiquelle Kinnard, Manuel Roman OF FILING CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Carson, Shanon)
May 7, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W. Pritchard on behalf of Prince Telecom, LLC (Pritchard, Robert)
May 6, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative and Additional Defenses by Prince Telecom, LLC.(Michalski, Christopher)
May 5, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC, Comcast Corporation.(Puma, Michael)
May 5, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian A. Angotti on behalf of Prince Telecom, LLC (Angotti, Christian)
May 5, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah J Miley on behalf of Prince Telecom, LLC (Miley, Sarah)
May 5, 2021 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Prince Telecom, LLC. (Michalski, Christopher)
May 5, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Michalski on behalf of Prince Telecom, LLC (Michalski, Christopher)
May 5, 2021 Filing 18 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Michael J. Puma. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 5/5/2021. (mw)
May 5, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Michael Puma, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
May 4, 2021 Filing 17 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Emily C. Reineberg on behalf of Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC, Comcast Corporation Attorney Michael J. Puma is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5566842., filed by on behalf of Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC, Comcast Corporation.(Reineberg, Emily)
May 4, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC, Comcast Corporation. (Reineberg, Emily)
May 4, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily C. Reineberg on behalf of Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC, Comcast Corporation (Reineberg, Emily)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 4/23/2021. (mw)
April 19, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Manuel Roman, Jiquelle Kinnard, Anthony Hayward. Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. (Carson, Shanon)
April 19, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Manuel Roman, Jiquelle Kinnard, Anthony Hayward. Comcast Corporation served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. (Carson, Shanon)
April 19, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint to Comcast Corporation served on Stefoni Murphy, authorized Agent on 04/15/2021, filed by Anthony Hayward, Jiquelle Kinnard, Manuel Roman. (Carson, Shanon)
April 19, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to refile Docs. 10 and 11 using the event: Civil Events Initial Pleadings and Service Service of Process- Summons Returned Executed. (pjr)
April 19, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Docs. 10 & 11 deleted and refiled as 12 & 13. (pjr)
April 15, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint to Prince Telecom, LLC served on Amy McLaren, authorized Agent on 04/15/2021, filed by Anthony Hayward, Jiquelle Kinnard, Manuel Roman. (Carson, Shanon)
April 15, 2021 Filing 7 Page 3 to Doc 6 by Anthony Hayward, Jiquelle Kinnard, Manuel Roman. #6 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice, Docket Annotation . (Savett, Stacy)
April 15, 2021 Filing 6 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Stacy Lynn Savett on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Stacy L. Savett is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5546329.. (Savett, Stacy)
April 15, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to refile page 3 of Doc. 6 listing local counsel that is generally admitted to practice in the Middle District of PA. (pjr)
April 15, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Stacy Savett, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
April 15, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Rambo. (pjr)
April 15, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Conner. (pjr)
April 14, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Anthony Hayward, Jiquelle Kinnard, Manuel Roman OF FILING CONSENTS TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Carson, Shanon)
April 14, 2021 Filing 4 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Camille Fundora Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Camille Fundora Rodriguez is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5545131.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Fundora Rodriguez, Camille)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel F. Thornton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Thornton, Daniel)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr)
April 14, 2021 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM for Camille Rodriguez, Stacy Savett, Carolyn Cottrell, Michelle Lim, and Ori Edelstein can be obtained at http://www.pamd.uscourts.gov/forms/petition-admission-practice. (pjr)
April 14, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Kane. (pjr)
April 14, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner, Camille Rodriguez, and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC, Comcast Corporation, Prince Telecom, LLC ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5544803), filed by Manuel Roman, Jiquelle Kinnard, Anthony Hayward. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roman et al v. Prince Telecom, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Puma
Represented By: Emily C. Reineberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Corporation
Represented By: Michael J. Puma
Represented By: Emily C. Reineberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prince Telecom, LLC
Represented By: Sarah J Miley
Represented By: Robert W. Pritchard
Represented By: Christian A. Angotti
Represented By: Christopher Michalski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Roman
Represented By: Camille Fundora Rodriguez
Represented By: Ori Edelstein
Represented By: Shanon J Carson
Represented By: Carolyn H. Cottrell
Represented By: Daniel F. Thornton
Represented By: Michelle S. Lim
Represented By: Stacy Savett
Represented By: Stacy Lynn Savett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Hayward
Represented By: Camille Fundora Rodriguez
Represented By: Ori Edelstein
Represented By: Shanon J Carson
Represented By: Carolyn H. Cottrell
Represented By: Daniel F. Thornton
Represented By: Michelle S. Lim
Represented By: Stacy Savett
Represented By: Stacy Lynn Savett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jiquelle Kinnard
Represented By: Camille Fundora Rodriguez
Represented By: Ori Edelstein
Represented By: Shanon J Carson
Represented By: Carolyn H. Cottrell
Represented By: Daniel F. Thornton
Represented By: Michelle S. Lim
Represented By: Stacy Savett
Represented By: Stacy Lynn Savett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?