United States of America v. Approximately $650,160.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $650,160.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 1:2021cv00716
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Filing 8 Verified Claim of Interest by Approximately $650,160.00 in U.S. Currency. #1 Complaint . (Nenner, David)
May 18, 2021 Filing 7 WARRANT of Arrest in Rem issued. (aaa)
May 6, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Warrant of Arrest in Rem by United States of America. (Camoni, Sean)
May 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint Notice of Forfeiture (Camoni, Sean)
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint Notice of Complaint (Camoni, Sean)
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint Notice of Complaint (Camoni, Sean)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2021 10:45 AM before Chief Judge John E. Jones III. See attached court calendar for dates that must be utilized in the JCMP when a trial month is selected (eo)
April 19, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Jones. (pjr)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against Approximately $650,160.00 in U.S. Currency, filed by United States of America.(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $650,160.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $650,160.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Sean A. Camoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?