Adlife Marketing & Communications Co. v. Karns Prime and Fancy Food Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Adlife Marketing & Communications Co.
Defendant: Fry Communications, Inc. and Karns Prime and Fancy Food Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00741
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Referring Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE by Adlife Marketing & Communications Co. to #17 Order, . (Dunne, Joseph)
June 14, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE by Fry Communications, Inc. to #17 Order, to Show Cause. (Hillwig, Craig)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Extend Time - Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 14) on or before June 23, 2021. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 6/9/21. (dmn)
June 7, 2021 Filing 19 Letter from Gregory S. Hirtzel, Esquire . (Hirtzel, Gregory)
June 4, 2021 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to To Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Adlife Marketing & Communications Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dunne, Joseph)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT the parties are directed to SHOW CAUSE, within ten (10) days of the date of this Order, why the above-captioned action should not be stayed pending the outcome of Plaintiffs appeal. See Order for complete details. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 6/4/21. (dmn)
June 2, 2021 Filing 16 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Zahra R. Dean. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 6/2/21. (dmn)
May 28, 2021 Filing 15 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Karns Prime and Fancy Food Ltd..(Hirtzel, Gregory)
May 28, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner & associate counsel bar status verified. (rw)
May 28, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to refiled the Brief in Support as to document #14 as a separate entry using the events: Motions and Related Filings> Responses and Replies (Briefs)> Brief in Support (rw)
May 26, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Karns Prime and Fancy Food Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Memo, #2 Proposed Order)(Hirtzel, Gregory)
May 26, 2021 Filing 13 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Zahra Dean on behalf of Fry Communications, Inc. Attorney Zahra Dean is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5588156.. (Dean, Zahra)
May 13, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory S. Hirtzel on behalf of Karns Prime and Fancy Food Ltd. (Hirtzel, Gregory)
May 13, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Reassign Case by Fry Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Concurrence /Non-Opposition, #2 Proposed Order)(Hillwig, Craig)
May 7, 2021 Filing 10 Letter from Joseph A. Dunne RE: DE 7 - Letter from Gregory S. Hirtzel. (Dunne, Joseph)
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fry Communications, Inc.. (Hillwig, Craig)
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig W. Hillwig on behalf of Fry Communications, Inc. (Hillwig, Craig)
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 Letter from Gregory S. Hirtzel, Attorney for Karns Prime and Fancy Food, Ltd. . (Hirtzel, Gregory)
May 7, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Adlife Marketing & Communications Co.. Fry Communications, Inc. waiver sent on 4/23/2021, answer due 6/22/2021. (Dunne, Joseph)
May 6, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Karns Prime and Fancy Food Ltd.. Karns Prime and Fancy Food Ltd. waiver sent on 4/23/2021, answer due 6/22/2021. (Hirtzel, Gregory)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2021 11:00 AM before Chief Judge John E. Jones III. See attached court calendar for dates that must be utilized in the JCMP when a trial month is selected(eo)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Fry Communications, Inc., Karns Prime and Fancy Food Ltd. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (rw)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 AO 121, REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT by Adlife Marketing & Communications Co. (Attachments: #1 Copyright Registration, Title of Work and Author)(rw)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fry Communications, and Inc., Karns Prime and Fancy Food Ltd. ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5554943), filed by Adlife Marketing & Communications Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(rw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adlife Marketing & Communications Co. v. Karns Prime and Fancy Food Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adlife Marketing & Communications Co.
Represented By: Joseph A Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fry Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Craig W. Hillwig
Represented By: Zahra Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karns Prime and Fancy Food Ltd.
Represented By: Benjamin P. Novak
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Vodzak
Represented By: Gregory S. Hirtzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?