Kauffman v. Mid-Atlantic Storage, Inc. Systems
Plaintiff: Michael Kauffman
Defendant: Mid-Atlantic Storage, Inc. Systems
Case Number: 1:2021cv00775
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Filing 7 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Abigail Barr (eo)
June 21, 2021 Filing 6 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Paul L. Bittner (eo)
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Paul L Bittner on behalf of Mid-Atlantic Storage, Inc. Systems Attorney Paul Bittner is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5612014.. (Bittner, Paul)
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Abigail Barr on behalf of Mid-Atlantic Storage, Inc. Systems Attorney Abigail J. Barr is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5611999.. (Barr, Abigail)
June 21, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorneys and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
May 13, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Michael Kauffman. Mid-Atlantic Storage, Inc. Systems waiver sent on 4/30/2021, answer due 6/29/2021. (Murphy, Michael)
April 30, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mid-Atlantic Storage, Inc. Systems and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
April 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mid-Atlantic Storage, Inc. Systems ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5561406), filed by Michael Kauffman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kauffman v. Mid-Atlantic Storage, Inc. Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Atlantic Storage, Inc. Systems
Represented By: Abigail Barr
Represented By: Paul L Bittner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kauffman
Represented By: Michael C. Groh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?