Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE Subscriber Assigned IP 71.207.108.188
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE Subscriber Assigned IP 71.207.108.188
Case Number: 1:2021cv00821
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC as to Defendant with prejudice (Saruya, Jason)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Serve. (eo)
May 14, 2021 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to the Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration David Williamson, #2 Declaration Patrick Paige, #3 Declaration Susan Stalzer, #4 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Saruya, Jason)
May 14, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to the Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saruya, Jason)
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Saruya, Jason)
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 AO121 sent to Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Title of Work)(ibr)
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to JOHN DOE Subscriber Assigned IP 71.207.108.188 and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ibr)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE Subscriber Assigned IP 71.207.108.188 ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5568202), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(ibr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE Subscriber Assigned IP 71.207.108.188
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jason M. Saruya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE Subscriber Assigned IP 71.207.108.188
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?