Smith v. Doulble A Taco, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Latasa Smith
Defendant: Doulble A Taco, LLC, Jane Doe, - and Aarsand Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01073
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION/ORDER - Plaintiff Latasha Smith and Defendant, Double A Taco, LLC, (hereinafter Defendant or Double A Taco), Aarsand Management, LLC (Aarsand) and Jane Doe (collectively Parties), hereby stipulate as follows:1. Plaintiff agrees to dismiss with prejudice and/or forebear upon furtherpursuing any federal claims arising out of the facts set forth in the AmendedComplaint. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/30/21. (dmn)
July 26, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE by Aarsand Management, LLC, Jane Doe, Doulble A Taco, LLC to #10 Order to Show Cause. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation)(Hennessy, Brendan)
July 21, 2021 Filing 12 VERBAL ORDER - It is ORDERED that defendants' motion #11 is GRANTED and defendants shall have until August 2, 2021, to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/21/21. (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) (spm)
July 21, 2021 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Amended Complaint by Aarsand Management, LLC, Jane Doe, Doulble A Taco, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hennessy, Brendan)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - On or before Monday, 7/26/21, dfts shall show cause why this case should not be remanded to state court. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/13/21. (ma)
July 8, 2021 Filing 9 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #3 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Latasa Smith.(Littman, Gregory)
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Latasa Smith.(Littman, Gregory)
June 29, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C. Littman on behalf of Latasa Smith (Littman, Gregory)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2021 at 02:15 PM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 6/25/21. (dmn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2021: #1 Calendar) (dmn).
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 COUNTY COURT RECORD from Dauphin County. (ibr)
June 24, 2021 Filing 4 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Aarsand Management, LLC, Jane Doe, Doulble A Taco, LLC.(Hennessy, Brendan)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Aarsand Management, LLC, Jane Doe, Doulble A Taco, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hennessy, Brendan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 CASE ASSIGNMENT ORDER. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 6/21/21. (dmn)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Doulble A Taco, LLC from Court of Common Pleas of Dauphin County, case number 2021-CV-00405-CV. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAMDC-5610446), filed by Doulble A Taco, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s))(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Doulble A Taco, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doulble A Taco, LLC
Represented By: Brendan D. Hennessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe, -
Represented By: Brendan D. Hennessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aarsand Management, LLC
Represented By: Brendan D. Hennessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latasa Smith
Represented By: Gregory C. Littman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?