Vazquez Calderon v. Saul
Plaintiff: Suhaily I. Vazquez Calderon
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2021cv01075
Filed: June 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Martin C Carlson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Carlson in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2021-08. (jkc)
June 24, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Andrew Saul, Suhaily I. Vazquez Calderon YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 7/26/2021. (kjn)
June 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Swauger on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Swauger, Melissa)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER 13-9 in Social Security Appeals. (aaa)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5611494), filed by Suhaily I. Vazquez Calderon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vazquez Calderon v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Melissa Swauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suhaily I. Vazquez Calderon
Represented By: Jason J. Schibinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?