Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 96.240.151.78
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 96.240.151.78
Case Number: 1:2021cv01226
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Jennifer P Wilson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Saruya, Jason)
August 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Levine on behalf of Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Levine, Kevin)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for leave to serve a third-party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 7/21/2021 (ve)
July 20, 2021 Filing 7 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson. (ve)
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Saruya, Jason)
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Patrick Paige, #3 Declaration Susan B. Stalzer, #4 Declaration David Williamson)(Saruya, Jason)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 AO121 sent to Copyright Office with Copy of Complaint and Docket Sheet. (aaa)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 96.240.151.78 and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (aaa)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 96.240.151.78 ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number BPAMDC-5632868), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 96.240.151.78
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jason M. Saruya
Represented By: Kevin Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 96.240.151.78
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?