McGee v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Christina McGee
Defendant: Kijakazi and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv01320
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Yvette Kane
Referring Judge: Susan E Schwab
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Honorable Yvette Kane and referred to Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab as one or more parties have not consented to the jurisdiction of a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (jkc)
August 20, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Kilolo Kijakazi, Christina McGee YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 9/20/2021 (ki)
August 20, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Swauger on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. (Swauger, Melissa)
August 19, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon AUSA - served on 8/18/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. (sm)
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed upon SSA on 8/17/21 A (sm)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed upon Atty General 8/16/21 (sm)
July 29, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kijakazi and provided TO U.S. MARSHAL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). After you make service, you are further directed to file a Return of Service using the event Summons Returned Executed as to USA under the category Service of Process, in ECF. (ki)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting pltf's app #3 to proceed IFP, deeming complaint filed, directing Clrk of Ct to issue process to USM who is directed to serve complaint in acc w/ FRCP 4(i) w/in 14 days, & directing that deft shall serve & file an answer w/ cert'd copy of transcript of admin record w/in 60 days of svc of the complaint. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 7/29/21. (ki)
July 28, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER 13-9 in Social Security Appeals. (ibr)
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form). (ibr)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Christina McGee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit) (ibr)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Christina McGee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ibr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGee v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina McGee
Represented By: Stephen J. Hogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Melissa Swauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?