Davis et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Doreen Davis and Evacio Valera
Defendant: State Farm Automobile Insurance Company and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv01608
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case CLOSED pursuant to notice #8 of voluntary dismissal. (mw)
October 11, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Doreen Davis, Evacio Valera (Cooper, Scott)
October 8, 2021 Filing 7 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1- Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - 8945 policy, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 - 3973 policy, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #6 Memo Brief in Support, #7 Certificate of Service)(McGrath, John)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2021 at 02:45 PM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Term. Calendar)(mw)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/23/2021. (mw)
September 23, 2021 Filing 4 VERBAL ORDER It is ORDERED that the motion #3 is GRANTED and defendant shall have until October 8, 2021, to file a response to the complaint. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/23/2021. (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) (mw)
September 23, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to to Respond to Complaintwith Cert of Concurrence by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1- Stipulation)(McGrath, John)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company. (McGrath, John)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company from Court of Common Pleas Dauphin County, case number 2021-CV-7036-CV. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAMDC-5698730), filed by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(ibr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreen Davis
Represented By: James C. Haggerty
Represented By: John Goodrich
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Scott B. Cooper
Represented By: Kevin Laukaitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evacio Valera
Represented By: James C. Haggerty
Represented By: John Goodrich
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Scott B. Cooper
Represented By: Kevin Laukaitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: John J. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurace Company
Represented By: John J. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?