Nazario v. Ransom et al
Petitioner: Mitchell Nazario
Respondent: Kevin J. Ransom and Pennsylvania Attorney General's Office
Case Number: 1:2021cv01655
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MP
Referring Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER STAYING CASE: 1.The above-captioned case is STAYED pending further Order of this Court;2.Nazario is directed to file, within (60) days of the date on which his state post-conviction proceedings conclude, a notice apprising the Court of the completion date of such proceedings and whether he intends to pursue his Section 2254 petn;3.Failure to comply with the time requirements set forth above will result in the stay being vacated nunc pro tunc, see Crews, 360 F.3d at 154(citation omitted);4.The Clerk of Court is directed to administratively CLOSE the above-captioned case. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 10/8/21. (ma)
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ELECTION by Mitchell Nazario. (aaa)
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER with Notice of Limitations on Filing of Future Petitions Under 28 U.S.C. Section 2254. Notice of election attached. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 9/28/21. (ma)
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the Warden or other appropriate official of the institution at which Plaintiff is currently incarcerated is directed to provide to the Court, under oath, or declare under penalty of perjury, a statement of the current balance in the Plaintiffs account and a record of the transactions in his account that have occurred with the preceding six (6) months. Order sent to Superintendent and petitioner. Signed by LP on 09/27/2021. (lp)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp)
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Stay this Proceeding Till (sic) Disposition of Pending State's Collateral Review... filed by Mitchell Nazario.(lp)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mitchell Nazario.(lp)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Mitchell Nazario.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nazario v. Ransom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mitchell Nazario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin J. Ransom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pennsylvania Attorney General's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?