The Hershey Company et al v. The Cookie Department, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Hershey Company and Hershey Chocolate & Confectionery LLC
Defendant: The Cookie Department, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01675
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2021 Filing 14 VERBAL ORDER - It is ORDERED that the motion #13 is GRANTED and defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended up to and including December 20, 2021. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/26/2021. (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) (spm)
November 26, 2021 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or other responsive pleading by The Cookie Department, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rumbaugh, Shane)
November 15, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Rumbaugh notified the Clerk of his general admission on November 5, 2021. (lg)
November 12, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane Rumbaugh on behalf of The Cookie Department, Inc. (Rumbaugh, Shane)
October 6, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Hershey Chocolate & Confectionery LLC, The Hershey Company. The Cookie Department, Inc. waiver sent on 10/5/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Young, Carol)
October 4, 2021 Filing 10 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Keyonn Pope. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/4/2021. (mw)
October 4, 2021 Filing 9 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Keyonn Pope on behalf of Hershey Chocolate & Confectionery LLC, The Hershey Company Attorney Keyonn Pope is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5715228., filed by on behalf of Hershey Chocolate & Confectionery LLC, The Hershey Company.(Pope, Keyonn)
October 4, 2021 Filing 8 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Monique Howery. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/4/2021. (mw)
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Monique B. Howery on behalf of Hershey Chocolate & Confectionery LLC, The Hershey Company Attorney Monique Howery is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5714552., filed by on behalf of Hershey Chocolate & Confectionery LLC, The Hershey Company.(Howery, Monique)
October 1, 2021 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Hershey Chocolate & Confectionery LLC identifying Corporate Parent The Hershey Company for Hershey Chocolate & Confectionery LLC. (Young, Carol)
October 1, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by The Hershey Company. (Young, Carol)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/29/2021. (mw)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an actionTRADEMARK. (Attachments: #1 List of Trademarks) (pjr)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Cookie Department, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr)
September 29, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petition for Special Admission for Keyonn Pope and Monique Howery can be obtained at http://www.pamd.uscourts.gov/forms/petition-admission-practice. Notice also sent via USPS. (pjr)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Cookie Department, Inc. ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5710117), filed by Hershey Chocolate & Confectionery LLC, The Hershey Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Hershey Company et al v. The Cookie Department, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Hershey Company
Represented By: Carol Steinour Young
Represented By: Keyonn Pope
Represented By: Lois Duquette
Represented By: Monique Howery
Represented By: Monique B. Howery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hershey Chocolate & Confectionery LLC
Represented By: Carol Steinour Young
Represented By: Keyonn Pope
Represented By: Lois Duquette
Represented By: Monique Howery
Represented By: Monique B. Howery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cookie Department, Inc.
Represented By: Shane Rumbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?