Ezeadiugwu v. PA Department of Labor/Industry
Plaintiff: Raymond Uche Ezeadiugwu
Defendant: PA Department of Labor/Industry
Case Number: 1:2021cv01698
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Saporito
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas II Marsilio, II on behalf of PA Department of Labor/Industry (Marsilio, Nicholas)
November 8, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Saporito in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2021-08. (jkc)
October 19, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to PA Department of Labor/Industry YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 11/18/2021 (ms)
October 19, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Raymond Uche Ezeadiugwu YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 11/18/2021 (ms)
October 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria G. Macus on behalf of PA Department of Labor/Industry (Macus, Maria)
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by PA Department of Labor/Industry. PA Department of Labor/Industry waiver sent on 10/4/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. (Macus, Maria)
October 7, 2021 Receipt of payment from RAYMOND ZEADIUGWU in the amount of $402.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE- NON-PRISONER. Transaction posted on 10/4/2021. Receipt number 111027666 processed by aarlidge. (jjs)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (ibr)
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER. (ibr)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to PA Department of Labor/Industry and provided TO ATTORNEY VIA U.S. MAIL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ibr)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PA Department of Labor/Industry ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 111027666), filed by Raymond Uche Ezeadiugwu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ibr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ezeadiugwu v. PA Department of Labor/Industry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Uche Ezeadiugwu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PA Department of Labor/Industry
Represented By: Maria G. Macus
Represented By: Nicholas II Marsilio, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?