Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 152.208.62.120
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 152.208.62.120
Case Number: 1:2021cv01707
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Jennifer P Wilson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2021 Filing 9 Final AO121 Report on the Filing of Action regarding Copyright. Register of Copyrights mailed copy of closing document. (ibr)
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC With Prejudice (Levine, Kevin)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting pltf's mtn for lv to serve a 3rd party subpoena #5 . See order for requirements. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 10/13/21. (ma)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION For Leave To Serve Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Levine, Kevin)
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION For Leave To Serve Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Patrick Paige, #3 Declaration Susan B. Stalzer, #4 Declaration David Williamson)(Levine, Kevin)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4 AO121 sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(aaa)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 152.208.62.120 and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Levine, Kevin)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Strike 3 Holdings, LLC ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number BPAMDC-5718099), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 152.208.62.120
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 152.208.62.120
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?