Iverson v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Elijah Iverson
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv01817
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: LT
Referring Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Conditions)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that the courts November 8, 2021 order (Doc. 7) is VACATED. The motion (Doc. 5) for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. Plaintiff must tender to the Clerk, U.S. District Court, a statutory filing fee in the amount of $350 and an administrative fee in the amount of $52, for a total payment of $402. Failure to comply with the terms of this order within 21 days of the date of this order will cause this case to be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/30/2021. (mw)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that the motion (Doc. #5 ) for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. Petitioner must tender to the Clerk, U.S. District Court, a statutory filing fee in the amount of $5.00. Failure to comply with the terms of this order within 21 days of the date of this order will cause this case to be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/8/2021 (mw)
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 Certified Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Elijah Iverson. (sm)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 Certified MOTION (application) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Elijah Iverson.(sm)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 10/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp)
October 26, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Instruction Sheet, #3 Fed and Local Rules, #4 398 Forms, #5 399 Form) (lp)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 Application to proceed in forma pauperis. incorrect form. (lp) Modified on 10/26/2021 (lp).
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America lodged by Elijah Iverson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Letter from U.S. Dept of Justice addressed to plaintiff in Regards to Administrative Claim No. TRT-NER-2021-05036 dated September 24, 2021, #2 Plaintiff's Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iverson v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elijah Iverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?