Bowles v. Pratt & Whitney
Plaintiff: Carol Bowles
Defendant: Pratt & Whitney and Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Pratt & Whitney Division
Case Number: 1:2021cv01918
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2022 at 02:15 PM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 1/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Term. Calendar)(mw)
December 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin L. Witherell on behalf of Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Pratt & Whitney Division (Witherell, Kristin)
December 20, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on April Lemon on 12/15/2021, filed by Carol Bowles. (Graff, Robert)
December 20, 2021 Filing 7 VERBAL ORDER It is ORDERED that the stipulation #5 is CONSTRUED as a motion to substitute the correct defendant and is GRANTED as so construed. The Clerk of Court shall amend the caption to reflect that the proper name of defendant is Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Pratt & Whitney Division. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 12/20/2021. (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) (mw)
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 VERBAL ORDER It is ORDERED that the stipulation #4 is CONSTRUED as a motion for extension of time and is GRANTED as so construed. Defendant shall have until January 19, 2022, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 12/20/2021. (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) (mw)
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Substitute the correct Defendant and Dismiss Claims against an Improper Defendant by Pratt & Whitney. (Witherell, Kristin)
December 20, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint to Extend Defendant's Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Pratt & Whitney. (Witherell, Kristin)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/12/2021. (mw)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Pratt & Whitney and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ibr)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pratt & Whitney ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5754455), filed by Carol Bowles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ibr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowles v. Pratt & Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Bowles
Represented By: Robert H. Graff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pratt & Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Pratt & Whitney Division
Represented By: Kristin L. Witherell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?