Banilla Games, Inc. et al v. Yorker Tobacco, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Banilla Games, Inc. and Grover Gaming, Inc.
Defendant: Yorker Tobacco, LLC, Maulik Patel, Bhogilal Patel and Harsh Barot
Case Number: 1:2021cv01960
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Jennifer P Wilson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 1/11/2022 (ve)
January 11, 2022 Filing 14 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Bhogilal Patel, Maulik Patel, Yorker Tobacco, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Marcon, Elizabeth)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 12/28/2021 (ve)
December 23, 2021 Filing 12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Yorker Tobacco, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Certificate of Concurrence)(Marcon, Elizabeth)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 12/20/2021 (ve)
December 16, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Concurrence by Bhogilal Patel, Maulik Patel, Yorker Tobacco, LLC re #8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint . (Marcon, Elizabeth)
December 16, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is directed to file a certificate of concurrence/nonconcurrence for Doc. 8. (ve)
December 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Howard Marcon on behalf of Bhogilal Patel, Maulik Patel, Yorker Tobacco, LLC. (Marcon, Elizabeth)
December 15, 2021 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Bhogilal Patel, Maulik Patel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certification of Elizabeth H. Marcon, #2 Proposed Order Order Extending Time to Answer)(Marcon, Elizabeth)
November 29, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Banilla Games, Inc., Grover Gaming, Inc.. Maulik Patel served on 11/26/2021, answer due 12/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on Maulik Patel)(Gorman, John)
November 29, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Banilla Games, Inc., Grover Gaming, Inc.. Bhogilal Patel served on 11/26/2021, answer due 12/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on Bhogilal Patel)(Gorman, John)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 AO 121 (Attachment: #1 Exhibit(s) A) mailed to Register of Copyrights on 11/18/2021.(eo)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Grover Gaming, Inc. (eo)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Banilla Games, Inc. (eo)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (eo)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5760679), filed by Banilla Games, Inc., Grover Gaming, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(eo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banilla Games, Inc. et al v. Yorker Tobacco, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Banilla Games, Inc.
Represented By: John V Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grover Gaming, Inc.
Represented By: John V Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yorker Tobacco, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Howard Marcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maulik Patel
Represented By: Elizabeth Howard Marcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bhogilal Patel
Represented By: Elizabeth Howard Marcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harsh Barot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?