JOHNSON v. BRADLEY
Petitioner: Melvin Johnson
Respondent: Sergeant Bradley
Case Number: 1:2021cv02067
Filed: December 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MP
Referring Judge: Sylvia H Rambo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by Bradley by Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. 1, Marlow Decl., with Attachs. A-D, #2 Exhibit(s) Ex. 2, Technical Reference Manual, Sentry Administrative Remedy)(Thiel, George)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting resp's mtn for exttm #12 . Response to the PwritHC is due by 1/25/22. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 12/29/21. (ma)
December 28, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thiel, George)
December 22, 2021 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed upon USA Hbg of order to show cause #10 , petition #1 and mem of law #2 Memorandum of Law by personal service. (ma)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: 1. The Court exercises its discretion under Rule 1(b) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the US DC to apply those rules to this 2241 petition;2. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of the petn #1 , the exhibits in support thereof #2 , and this Order on Resp and the USA, and to note the address of the USA on the front of the docket sheet in this case. All documents filed by the parties and by the Court shall be served upon the USA;3. Within (20) days of the date of this Order, Resp shall file a response to the allegations of the petn.4. Petr shall, if he so desires, file a reply to Resps response within (14) days after its filing; and5. A determination as to whether Petr shall be produced for a hearing will be held in abeyance pending the filing of Resps answer or other pleading. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 12/22/21. (ma)
December 9, 2021 Filing 9 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp)
December 9, 2021 Filing 8 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 3:21-cv-00182 containing electronic documents. jw
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM ORDER transferring #6 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by MELVIN JOHNSON to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania, Scranton Division. The Clerk of Court is ordered to mark this case CLOSED and TRANSFER forthwith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on December 6, 2021. (kcb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 12/9/2021.]
November 2, 2021 Filing 6 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $5, Receipt #34668005755 ), filed by MELVIN JOHNSON. (sdp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 12/9/2021.]
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 34668005755 (sdp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 12/9/2021.]
November 2, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 34668005755 (sdp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 12/9/2021.]
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the Clerk of Court is to mark this case closed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Petitioner may reopen the case by paying the $5.00 filing fee or submitting a motion to proceed in forma pauperis and a certified copy of the account statement for the six (6) months preceding the filing of the complaint within 30 days from the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are allowed fourteen (14) days from this date to appeal this order to a District Judge pursuant to Rule 72.C.2 of the Local Rules. Failure to appeal within fourteen (14) days will constitute waiver of the right to appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 10/27/2021. (jmb) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 12/9/2021.]
October 12, 2021 Filing 2 BRIEF in Support of #1 PETITION filed by MELVIN JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Envelope) (sdp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 12/9/2021.]
October 12, 2021 Filing 1 Remark: Habeas Petition lodged without Motion for In Forma Pauperis or payment of filing fee (Attachments: #1 COVER LETTER) (sdp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 12/9/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. BRADLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Melvin Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sergeant Bradley
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: George Michael Thiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?