Scott v. Fiestas WVA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Scott
Defendant: Fiestas WVA, LLC doing business as Taco Bell and Aarsand Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00025
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Jennifer P Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Michael Scott. Aarsand Management, LLC waiver sent on 2/10/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. (Arora, Manali)
March 2, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan D. Hennessy on behalf of Aarsand Management, LLC (Hennessy, Brendan)
February 22, 2022 Filing 5 CIVIL PRACTICE ORDER Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 2/22/22. (pjr)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT: This case has been selected at random for mandatory referral to court annexed mediation in accordance with Standing Order 04-3. The initial case management conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 will be conducted via telephone by the court on April 7, 2022, at 8:45 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the telephone conference and have all parties on the line prior to calling chambers at (717) 221-3970. See order for further details. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 2/22/2022. (ve)
January 13, 2022 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson. (ve)
January 6, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
January 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5805719), filed by Michael Scott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Fiestas WVA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Scott
Represented By: Manali Arora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiestas WVA, LLC doing business as Taco Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aarsand Management, LLC
Represented By: Brendan D. Hennessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?