Maze v. Oliver et al
Petitioner: Brandon Jalon Maze
Respondent: Lonnie Oliver, Pennsylvania Attorney General's Office, Matthew Fogal and Attorney Ian M. Brink
Case Number: 1:2022cv00456
Filed: March 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: SM
Referring Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by Ian M. Brink by Ian M. Brink. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s))(Brink, Ian)
May 9, 2022 Filing 7 (CERTIFIED) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Authorized Prison Official. (ga)
May 9, 2022 Filing 6 (CERTIFIED) Application To Proceed InForma Pauperis (filing fee paid). (ga)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of the petition (Doc. No. 1) and this Order on Respondent Lonnie Oliver, the Attorney General of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, and the District Attorney of Franklin County. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/3/22. (dmn)
May 2, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ELECTION by Brandon Jalon Maze. (ga)
April 4, 2022 Filing 3 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER with Notice of Limitations on Filing of Future Petitions Under 28 U.S.C. Section 2254. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 4/4/22. (dmn)
March 29, 2022 Receipt of payment from BRANDON MAZE in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 3/28/2022. Receipt number 333080497 processed by gangeli. (jjs)
March 28, 2022 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp)
March 28, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $5, Receipt Number 333080497), filed by Brandon Jalon Maze. (Attachments: #1 Receipt of Filing Fee Paid)(lp) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/28/2022) (lp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maze v. Oliver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brandon Jalon Maze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lonnie Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pennsylvania Attorney General's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Fogal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney Ian M. Brink
Represented By: Ian M. Brink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?