Gorrio v. Warden of Dauphin County Prison et al
Petitioner: Michael Gorrio
Respondent: Warden of Dauphin County Prison, Pennsylvania Attorney General's Office and Commowealth of Pennsylvania
Case Number: 1:2022cv00562
Filed: April 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: SM
Referring Judge: Yvette Kane
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Accordingly, a COA should not be issued. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/20/22. (dmn)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER of USCA remanding appeal to District Court for the purpose of either issuance of a certificate of appealability or a statement of reasons why one should not issue. The appeal is STAYED pending determination by the District Court. (McIntyre, Timothy)
May 12, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL in PRISONER Case by Michael Gorrio. Filing Fee and Docket Fee NOT PAID. Filing fee $ 505 The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (rw)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. Petitioners motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. No. #2 ) is GRANTED, and his petition for a writ of habeas corpus, filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 (Doc. No. #1 ), is DEEMED filed;2. Petitioners petition for a writ of habeas corpus (Doc. No. #1 ) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and 3. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by the Honorable Yvette Kane on April 29, 2022. (kjn)
April 29, 2022 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus(Lodged with Motion for IFP) filed by Michael Gorrio. Signed by the Honorable Yvette Kane on April 29, 2022. (kjn)
April 18, 2022 Filing 4 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp)
April 18, 2022 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Michael Gorrio. (lp)
April 18, 2022 Filing 2 Handwritten Motion for IFP and attached CERTIFIED Form MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Gorrio.(lp)
April 18, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Michael Gorrio. Petition submitted as a 2241 Petition (Attachments: #1 Handwritten Petition)(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gorrio v. Warden of Dauphin County Prison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Gorrio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of Dauphin County Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pennsylvania Attorney General's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commowealth of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?