CARTER v. CLERK OF COURTS et al
Petitioner: Nigel Dedieece Carter
Respondent: Clerk of Courts, District Attorney's Office Of Chester County Pa and Pennsylvania Attorney General's Office
Case Number: 1:2022cv00580
Filed: April 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: LT
Referring Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that the motion for reconsideration (Doc. #13 ) is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 6/9/2022 (mw)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that the motion (Doc. #14 ) to appoint counsel is DENIED without prejudice. If further proceedings demonstrate the need for counsel, the matter will be reconsidered either sua sponte or upon motion of petitioner. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 6/9/2022 (mw)
June 3, 2022 Filing 15 RESPONSE by Nigel Dedieece Carter to #12 Order. (pjr)
June 1, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Nigel Dedieece Carter.(pjr)
May 25, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Reconsideration re #10 Order (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry),, Order Dismissing Case, #9 Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry) by Nigel Dedieece Carter.(aaa)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that the amended petition for writ of habeas corpus (Doc. 11) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This case shall remain closed in accordance with the courts May 2, 2022 order. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 5/11/2022. (mw)
May 10, 2022 Filing 11 "AMENDED PETITION" by Nigel Dedieece Carter., Amendment to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (sm)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - it is hereby ORDERED that the petition (Doc. 1) for writ of habeas corpus is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 5/2/2022. (mw)
May 2, 2022 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry). Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 5/2/2022. (mw)
April 22, 2022 Filing 8 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (lp)
April 21, 2022 Filing 7 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:22-cv-00964 containing electronic documents.
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FORTHWITH TRANSFER THIS CASE TO THE CLERK OF THE UNITED STATES COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. CLOSE THIS CASE IN THIS DISTRICT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/8/22. 4/11/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/21/2022.]
April 1, 2022 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number PPE238581 (bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/21/2022.]
April 1, 2022 Filing 4 Response To Order (Filing Fee Paid) by NIGEL DEDIEECE CARTER. (bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/21/2022.]
March 24, 2022 Notice PSG #2 and Order #3 mailed to Carter. (fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/21/2022.]
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT IF MR. CARTER SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THE CASE INCLUSING OUR REVIEW OF HIS REQUEST HE MUST, NO LATER THAN APRIL 15, 2022 EITHER: PAY THE REQUIRED $5 FILING FEE TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR COMPLETE AND RETURN THE APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, INCLUSING THE REQUIRED CERTIFICATION OF PRISONS ASSETS SIGNED BY A PRIOSN OFFICIAL, TO THE CLERK OF COURT; AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 3/15/22. 3/16/22 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/21/2022.]
March 11, 2022 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/21/2022.]
March 11, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by NIGEL DEDIEECE CARTER. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FILED)(bw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 4/21/2022.] Modified on 4/21/2022 (lp). submitted on 2241 form

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARTER v. CLERK OF COURTS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nigel Dedieece Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Clerk of Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: District Attorney's Office Of Chester County Pa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pennsylvania Attorney General's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?