Hagan v. Harry et al
Plaintiff: Damont Hagan
Defendant: Laurel Harry, U/K Gourley, U/K Stein, John Doe, U/K Gross and U/K Funk
Case Number: 1:2022cv00868
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CA
Referring Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by U/K Gross, U/K Stein, U/K Gourley, U/K Funk, Laurel Harry. (Bedell, Lindsey)
July 25, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey A. Bedell on behalf of All Defendants (Bedell, Lindsey)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that the motion (Doc. #9 ) is GRANTED. Any and all claims against the John Doe defendant are DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). The Clerk of Court is directed to TERMINATE John Doe as a defendant in this action. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/7/2022 (mw)
July 7, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Party John Doe by Damont Hagan.(ao)
June 24, 2022 Filing 8 Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to U/K Funk, U/K Gourley, U/K Gross, and Laurel Harry, U/K Stein - Waiver of Service due by 7/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Labels)(mw)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS - it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs application to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. (Doc. [4)]. The complaint is DEEMED filed. The Clerk of Court is directed to SERVE the named defendants. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 6/24/2022. (mw)
June 24, 2022 Filing 6 AO 398 and AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (ep)
June 24, 2022 Filing 5 (CERTIFIED) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Damont Hagan. (ep)
June 24, 2022 Filing 4 (CERTIFIED) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Damont Hagan.(ep)
June 2, 2022 Filing 3 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 06/02/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp)
June 2, 2022 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Instruction Sheet, #3 Fed and Local Rules, #4 398 Forms, #5 399 Form) (lp)
June 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Damont Hagan.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hagan v. Harry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damont Hagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurel Harry
Represented By: Lindsey A. Bedell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U/K Gourley
Represented By: Lindsey A. Bedell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U/K Stein
Represented By: Lindsey A. Bedell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U/K Gross
Represented By: Lindsey A. Bedell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U/K Funk
Represented By: Lindsey A. Bedell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?