Siegfried v. Roman Health Ventures Inc
Plaintiff: Gavin Siegfried
Defendant: Roman Health Ventures Inc
Case Number: 1:2023cv00215
Filed: February 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Roman Health Ventures Inc. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 6/2/2023. (mw)
June 2, 2023 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Roman Health Ventures Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Adonizio, Peter)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 6/7/2023 at 01:30 PM before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. At least five days before the conference,counsel shall file their joint case management plan with the court. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 5/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Term. Calendar)(mw)
May 2, 2023 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Roman Health Ventures Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Adonizio, Peter)
May 2, 2023 Filing 15 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Roman Health Ventures Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Adonizio, Peter)
April 18, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Roman Health Ventures Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit(s) Decl. Ex. A, #3 Exhibit(s) Decl. Ex. B, #4 Exhibit(s) Decl. Ex. C, #5 Exhibit(s) Decl. Ex. D, #6 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #7 Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(Adonizio, Peter)
April 14, 2023 Filing 13 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Mara A. O'Malley. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 4/14/2023. (mw)
April 14, 2023 Filing 12 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Scott T. Lashway. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 4/14/2023. (mw)
April 14, 2023 Filing 11 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Mara O'Malley on behalf of Roman Health Ventures Inc Attorney Mary A. O'Malley is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6259109.. (O'Malley, Mara)
April 14, 2023 Filing 10 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Scott T Lashway on behalf of Roman Health Ventures Inc Attorney Scott T. Lashway is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6259104.. (Lashway, Scott)
April 14, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa)
April 13, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie E. Ravis on behalf of Roman Health Ventures Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ravis, Julie)
April 12, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J Adonizio, Jr on behalf of Roman Health Ventures Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Adonizio, Peter)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 2/7/2023. (mw)
February 6, 2023 Filing 6 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:23-cv-00415 containing electronic documents. jw
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA PURSUANT TO 28 USC SEC. 1406(A). THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 2/3/23. 2/3/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/6/2023.]
February 2, 2023 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by GAVIN SIEGFRIED. (ZEMEL, DANIEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/6/2023.]
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT, PLAINTIFF SHALL SHOW CAUSE IN A MEMORANDUM NOT TO EXCEED SEVEN (7) PAGES, FILED ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 10, 2023, WHY VENUE IS PROPER IN THIS DISTRICT AND WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT TRANSFER THIS MATTER TO THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA, THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK, OR ANOTHER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1406(A) OR 28 U.S.C. 1404(A). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 2/02/2023. 2/02/2023 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/6/2023.]
February 2, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ROMAN HEALTH VENTURES INC. Forwarded To: Daniel Zemel on 2/2/23 (fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/6/2023.]
February 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROMAN HEALTH VENTURES INC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16473337.), filed by GAVIN SIEGFRIED. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Designation Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ZEMEL, DANIEL) (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/2/2023) (sbt). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/6/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siegfried v. Roman Health Ventures Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gavin Siegfried
Represented By: Daniel Zemel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Health Ventures Inc
Represented By: Peter J Adonizio, Jr.
Represented By: Mara O'Malley
Represented By: Julie E. Ravis
Represented By: Scott T Lashway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?