St. Remy v. Greene
Petitioner: Julien Michel St. Remy
Respondent: Warden F. Greene
Case Number: 1:2024cv01423
Filed: August 21, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: LT
Referring Judge: Christopher C Conner
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2024 Filing 8 TRAVERSE by Julien Michel St. Remy to #7 Response to Petition for Habeas Corpus,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(ll)
September 16, 2024 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by Warden F. Greene by Warden F. Greene. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, Declaration of Joshua Bower, #3 Attachment A, Public Information Inmate Data, #4 Attachment B, Administrative Remedy Generalized Retrieval, #5 Attachment C, Institutional Referral for CCC Placement, #6 Attachment D, FSA Time Credit Assessment, #7 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Swauger, Melissa)
August 28, 2024 Filing 6 SHOW CAUSE ORDER and Petition for Habeas Corpus Served on US Attorney. (mw)
August 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The Clerk of Court is directed to SERVE a copy of the petition (Doc. 1) and this order on respondent and the United States Attorney. All documents filed by the parties and by the court shall be served upon the United States Attorney. Respondent shall file, within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order, an answer to the petition. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 8/26/2024. (mw)
August 22, 2024 Receipt of payment from DPAM124CV001423 in the amount of $5.00 for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Transaction posted on 8/21/2024. Receipt number 333111290 processed by CP. (jjs)
August 21, 2024 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 333111290. Petition is now deemed FILED. (dj)
August 21, 2024 Filing 3 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 08/21/2024. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp)
August 21, 2024 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp)
August 21, 2024 Filing 1 "Emergency" PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Julien Michel St. Remy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits - Various Unidentified Documents)(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Remy v. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Julien Michel St. Remy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden F. Greene
Represented By: Melissa Swauger
Represented By: Richard D Euliss
Represented By: George Michael Thiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?