Scott v. Thaddeus Stevens College of Technology et al
Plaintiff: Juan Salas Scott
Defendant: Pedro Rivera, Christopher Metzler, Valdijah Ambrose Brown, Hostler, John Doe 1, Michael Degroft, Thaddeus Stevens College of Technology, Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2 and PA Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2024cv01798
Filed: October 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan E Schwab
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - that Scott has satisfied the order to show cause, but his request for return of the filing fee is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 12/11/24. (ae)
December 9, 2024 Filing 7 RESPONSE by Juan Salas Scott to #6 Order to Show Cause. (aaa)
December 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. that Scott shall show cause, if there is any, on or before December 17, 2024, why the order granting his application to proceed in forma pauperis should not be vacated given that he has paid the filing fee. In other words, Scott shall explain how he was financially able to pay the filing fee after representing to the court that he is unable to pay the costs of this case. Show Cause Response due by 12/17/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 12/3/24. (ae)
November 26, 2024 Receipt of payment from JUAN SALAS SCOTT in the amount of $405.00 for Civil Filing Fee- Non-Prisoner. Transaction posted on 11/25/2024. Receipt number 111102976 processed by AA. (jjs)
November 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The complaint is now deemed filed. The undersigned Magistrate Judge shall conduct a preliminary review of Scott's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 11/25/24. (ae)
November 22, 2024 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Juan Salas Scott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa)
October 18, 2024 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (Attachments: #1 Local Rules) (aaa)
October 18, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Juan Salas Scott.(aaa)
October 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Juan Salas Scott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Thaddeus Stevens College of Technology et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Metzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valdijah Ambrose Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hostler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Degroft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thaddeus Stevens College of Technology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PA Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Salas Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?