John Doe 1 et al v. Cumberland Valley School District et al
Plaintiff: John Doe 1 and Jane Doe 1
Defendant: Bethany Mullin, Talia Merlie, Harold Shaffner, CV Eagles Cheerleading Boosters, Michael Craig, Kristi Shaffner, Tanya Pickel, Cumberland Valley School District, Amanda Peterson Martin, Dr. Jesse Rawls, Jr. and Mark A. Blanchard, Ed.D
Case Number: 1:2024cv01919
Filed: November 7, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Jennifer P Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2024 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by John Doe 1. CV Eagles Cheerleading Boosters waiver sent on 11/15/2024, answer due 1/14/2025. (Farneth, George)
December 18, 2024 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by John Doe 1. Jesse Rawls, Jr. waiver sent on 11/15/2024, answer due 1/14/2025. (Farneth, George)
December 18, 2024 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by John Doe 1. Cumberland Valley School District waiver sent on 11/15/2024, answer due 1/14/2025. (Farneth, George)
December 18, 2024 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by John Doe 1. Michael Craig waiver sent on 11/15/2024, answer due 1/14/2025. (Farneth, George)
December 18, 2024 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by John Doe 1. Mark A. Blanchard, EdD waiver sent on 11/15/2024, answer due 1/14/2025. (Farneth, George)
December 9, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Gilboy on behalf of Michael Craig, Cumberland Valley School District, Mark A. Blanchard, EdD, Jesse Rawls, Jr. (Gilboy, Jacob)
December 9, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Conrad on behalf of Michael Craig, Cumberland Valley School District, Mark A. Blanchard, EdD, Jesse Rawls, Jr. (Conrad, Christopher)
December 5, 2024 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Talia Merlie. Talia Merlie waiver sent on 11/7/2024, answer due 1/6/2025. (Kaster, Bryon)
December 5, 2024 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Amanda Peterson Martin. Amanda Peterson Martin waiver sent on 11/7/2024, answer due 1/6/2025. (Kaster, Bryon)
December 5, 2024 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Kristi Shaffner. Kristi Shaffner waiver sent on 11/7/2024, answer due 1/6/2025. (Kaster, Bryon)
December 5, 2024 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Harold Shaffner. Harold Shaffner waiver sent on 11/7/2024, answer due 1/6/2025. (Kaster, Bryon)
December 5, 2024 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Bethany Mullin. Bethany Mullin waiver sent on 11/7/2024, answer due 1/6/2025. (Kaster, Bryon)
November 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re. Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 11/14/24. (ma)
November 7, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ll)
November 7, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405, Receipt Number APAMDC-6810707), filed by John Doe 1, Jane Doe 1. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ll)
November 7, 2024 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Farneth is to update his phone number through PACER, the phone number on the complaint should match the phone number on the docket. (ll)
November 7, 2024 DOCKET ANNOTATION: An email was sent to attorney Miller advising him to apply for pro hac vice or general admission. (ll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Doe 1 et al v. Cumberland Valley School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethany Mullin
Represented By: Bryon R. Kaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talia Merlie
Represented By: Bryon R. Kaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Shaffner
Represented By: Bryon R. Kaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CV Eagles Cheerleading Boosters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Craig
Represented By: Jacob Gilboy
Represented By: Christopher J. Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Shaffner
Represented By: Bryon R. Kaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Pickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cumberland Valley School District
Represented By: Jacob Gilboy
Represented By: Christopher J. Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Peterson Martin
Represented By: Bryon R. Kaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jesse Rawls, Jr.
Represented By: Jacob Gilboy
Represented By: Christopher J. Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Blanchard, Ed.D
Represented By: Jacob Gilboy
Represented By: Christopher J. Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 1
Represented By: Nicholas A. Miller
Represented By: George R. Farneth, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1
Represented By: Nicholas A. Miller
Represented By: George R. Farneth, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?