Doe v. Cumberland Valley School District et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe, -
Defendant: Harold Shaffner, Cumberland Valley School District, Mark A. Blanchard, Dr. Jesse Rawls, Jr., Greg Rausch, Bud and Timothy Froelich
Case Number: 1:2025cv00158
Filed: January 24, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Jennifer P Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT: The initial case management conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 will be conducted via telephone by the court on May 21, 2025, at 1:30 p.m.1 The parties shall call-in to the conference calling number 717-638-8977, using the phone conference ID 432 592 125#. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 3/4/2025. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Calendar)(ve)
February 25, 2025 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Gilboy on behalf of Timothy Froelich, Cumberland Valley School District, Mark A. Blanchard, Jesse Rawls, Jr, Greg Rausch, Harold Shaffner (Gilboy, Jacob)
February 25, 2025 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Conrad on behalf of Timothy Froelich, Cumberland Valley School District, Mark A. Blanchard, Jesse Rawls, Jr, Greg Rausch, Harold Shaffner (Conrad, Christopher)
February 25, 2025 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Jane Doe. Mark A. Blanchard waiver sent on 1/29/2025, answer due 3/31/2025. (Farneth, George)
February 25, 2025 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Jane Doe. Jesse Rawls, Jr waiver sent on 1/29/2025, answer due 3/31/2025. (Farneth, George)
February 25, 2025 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Jane Doe. Harold Shaffner waiver sent on 1/29/2025, answer due 3/31/2025. (Farneth, George)
February 25, 2025 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Jane Doe. Greg Rausch waiver sent on 1/29/2025, answer due 3/31/2025. (Farneth, George)
February 25, 2025 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Jane Doe. Timothy Froelich waiver sent on 1/29/2025, answer due 3/31/2025. (Farneth, George)
February 25, 2025 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Jane Doe. Cumberland Valley School District waiver sent on 1/29/2025, answer due 3/31/2025. (Farneth, George)
February 24, 2025 Filing 5 CIVIL PRACTICE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 2/24/2025. (ve)
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 2/24/2025. (ve)
February 24, 2025 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson. (ve)
February 4, 2025 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Miller is directed to file for special admission or make arrangements to be generally admitted. (ea)
January 24, 2025 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa)
January 24, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405, Receipt Number APAMDC-6879796), filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Cumberland Valley School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Shaffner
Represented By: Jacob Gilboy
Represented By: Christopher J. Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cumberland Valley School District
Represented By: Jacob Gilboy
Represented By: Christopher J. Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Blanchard
Represented By: Jacob Gilboy
Represented By: Christopher J. Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jesse Rawls, Jr.
Represented By: Jacob Gilboy
Represented By: Christopher J. Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Rausch
Represented By: Jacob Gilboy
Represented By: Christopher J. Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bud
Represented By: Jacob Gilboy
Represented By: Christopher J. Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Froelich
Represented By: Jacob Gilboy
Represented By: Christopher J. Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe, -
Represented By: George R. Farneth, II
Represented By: Nicholas A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?